Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1309915

EP1309915 - MIGRATING PROCESSES USING DATA REPRESENTATION LANGUAGE REPRESENTATIONS OF THE PROCESSES IN A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SLAUGHTER, Gregory, L.
3326 Emerson St.
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / SAULPAUGH, Thomas, E.
6938 Bret Harte Dr.
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
03 / TRAVERSAT, Bernard, A.
701 Fremont Street
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2003/28]
Former [2003/20]01 / SLAUGHTER, Gregory, L.
3326 Emerson St.
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / SAULPAUGH, Thomas, E.
6938 Bret Harte Dr.
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
03 / TRAVERSAT, Bernard, A.
2055 California St., Apt. 402
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
Representative(s)Harris, Ian Richard
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]Harris, Ian Richard
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date01935278.009.05.2001
[2003/20]
WO2001US15132
Priority number, dateUS20000202975P09.05.2000         Original published format: US 202975 P
US20000208011P26.05.2000         Original published format: US 208011 P
US20000209430P02.06.2000         Original published format: US 209430 P
US20000209140P02.06.2000         Original published format: US 209140 P
US20000209525P05.06.2000         Original published format: US 209525 P
US2000066356415.09.2000         Original published format: US 663564
[2003/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0186440
Date:15.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1309915
Date:14.05.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1309915
Date:10.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/50
[2003/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:MIGRATION VON PROZESSEN UNTER BENUTZUNG EINER DARSTELLUNG DIESER PROZESSE IN EINER DATEN-DARSTELLUNGSSPRACHE IN EINER VERTEILTEN RECHNERUMGEBUNG[2003/42]
English:MIGRATING PROCESSES USING DATA REPRESENTATION LANGUAGE REPRESENTATIONS OF THE PROCESSES IN A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT[2003/20]
French:MIGRATION DE PROCESSUS AU MOYEN DE REPRESENTATION DES PROCESSUS EN LANGAGE DE REPRESENTATION DE DONNEES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE DISTRIBUE[2003/42]
Former [2003/20]MIGRATION VON PROZESSEN UNTER BENUTZUNG EINER DARSTELLUNG EINER DATEN-DARSTELLUNGSSPRACHE DIESER PROZESSE IN EINER VERTEILTEN RECHNERUMGEBUNG
Former [2003/20]PROCEDE DE MIGRATION AU MOYEN DE REPRESENTATION DE LANGAGE DE REPRESENTATION DE DONNEES DE PROCEDES DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE DISTRIBUE
Entry into regional phase25.11.2002National basic fee paid 
25.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/20]
26.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2003Fee for grant paid
16.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
CY10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
IT10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
IE10.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
PT10.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
CY10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
IT10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
IE10.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2007/10]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
CY10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
IE10.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2006/51]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
TR10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
IE10.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/24]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
IE10.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/23]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
LU09.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/18]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK10.06.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/11]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
MC31.05.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/05]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
NL10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/02]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
ES21.06.2004
Former [2005/01]AT10.03.2004
BE10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/44]AT10.03.2004
CH10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
LI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT10.03.2004
FI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI10.03.2004
GR10.06.2004
SE10.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI10.03.2004
SE10.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2332288  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD) [X] 1,5,18-21,26,51,54,60-64,66 * page 30, line 28 - page 31, line 12 * * page 38, line 4 - page 39, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0969364  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,19,27,41,51,61 * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 39 * * column 10, line 40 - column 11, line L *;
 [A]  - W. EMMERICH ET AL, "Incremental code mobility with XML", TECHNICAL REPORT 99-95, Unervisity College London, (199910), pages 1 - 10, XP002211475 [A] 1,18,19,26,27,40,41,50,51,60,61,66 * page 2, column R, line 14 - line 25 * * page 7, column L, line 17 - column R, line 13; figure 12 *
 [A]  - IBM ET AL, "Mobile Agent Facility Specification", MOBILE AGENT FACILITY SPECIFICATION, XX, XX, (19970602), XP002143104 [A] 1,19,27,41,51,61 * page 11 * * page 30 *
 [A]  - MUELLER-WILKEN S ET AL, "XML and Jini - On Using XML and the JAVA Border Service Architecture to integrate mobile devices into the JAVA Intelligent Network Infrastructure", (20000229), XP002188507 [A] 1,18,19,27,40,41,50,51,60,61,66 * the whole document *
 [A]  - K EDWARDS, Core Jini, 1ST EDITION, PRENTICE HALL PTR, (199906), XP002211482 [A] 1-66 * page 320, line 6 - page 329, line 15 * * page 405, line 5 - page 419, line L * * page 635, line 1 - page 656, line L *