blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1272397

EP1272397 - POURING SPOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAUSER-WERKE GmbH & Co. KG
Schildgesstrasse 71 - 163
50321 Brühl / DE
For all designated states
Innovationen & Vertrieb
Heydaer Strasse 37a
98693 Martinroda / DE
[2003/02]
Inventor(s)01 / MORGENROTH, Ingolf
Heydaer Strasse 37 a
98693 Martinroda / DE
 [2003/02]
Application number, filing date01936235.912.04.2001
[2003/02]
WO2001EP04256
Priority number, dateDE200011849514.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10018495
DE200015133617.10.2000         Original published format: DE 10051336
[2003/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0179067
Date:25.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1272397
Date:08.01.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1272397
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:B65D25/40, B65D47/06
[2003/02]
CPC:
B65D47/06 (EP,US); B65D23/04 (EP,US); B65D2205/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/02]
Extension statesLTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSGIESSER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER[2003/37]
English:POURING SPOUT[2003/02]
French:DISPOSITIF VERSEUR POUR CONTENANTS A LIQUIDES[2003/02]
Former [2003/02]AUSGIE?ER FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER
Entry into regional phase21.09.2002National basic fee paid 
21.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
28.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2003Fee for grant paid
26.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200303   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2003
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
LU12.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
DK03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/10]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
LU12.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
DK03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/23]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
LU12.04.2004
MC30.04.2004
DK03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/18]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
MC30.04.2004
DK03.06.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/03]FI03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
MC30.04.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2005/02]FI03.03.2004
MC30.04.2004
SE03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
SE03.06.2004
Cited inInternational search[YA]US3361307  (GEORGE CLARE) [Y] 8 * column W * [A] 1-7,9-13;
 [YX]FR2098644  (KRAUTKRAMER GUNTER) [Y] 6,9,11 * the whole document * [X] 1,2,5;
 [YA]DE2356685  (LION FAT OIL CO LTD) [Y] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-12;
 [X]AT317019B  (SCHIEMANN DR WOLFRAM [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8701056U  (W. FROHN) [A] 1-13* the whole document *;
 [Y]US4705192  (KNAPTON PAUL A [US]) [Y] 10 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 6 *;
 [XPY]WO0056619  (PACK PRO KUNSTSTOFF UND METALL [AT], et al) [XP] 1-5,7,12 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8-11,13
by applicantEP0047757
 JPS63229670
 EP0677445
 DE29720426U
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.