Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1285323

EP1285323 - REMOTE METHOD INVOCATION WITH SECURE MESSAGING IN A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.01.2008
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oracle America, Inc.
500 Oracle Parkway
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
[2011/10]
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
4150 Network Circle
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
Former [2003/09]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SLAUGHTER, Gregory, L.
3326 Emerson St.
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / SAULPAUGH, Thomas, E.
6938 Bret Harte Dr.
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
03 / TRAVERSAT, Bernard, A.
701 Fremont Street, Menlo Park
California 94025 / US
04 / DUIGOU, Michael, J.
33928 Capulet Circle
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
 [2003/19]
Former [2003/09]01 / SLAUGHTER, Gregory, L.
3326 Emerson St.
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / SAULPAUGH, Thomas, E.
6938 Bret Harte Dr.
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
03 / TRAVERSAT, Bernard, A.
2055 California St., Apt. 402
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
04 / DUIGOU, Michael, J.
33928 Capulet Circle
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/09]Harris, Ian Richard
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date01937316.609.05.2001
[2003/09]
WO2001US15277
Priority number, dateUS20000202975P09.05.2000         Original published format: US 202975 P
US20000208011P26.05.2000         Original published format: US 208011 P
US20000209430P02.06.2000         Original published format: US 209430 P
US20000209140P02.06.2000         Original published format: US 209140 P
US20000209525P05.06.2000         Original published format: US 209525 P
US2000067214527.09.2000         Original published format: US 672145
[2003/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0186395
Date:15.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1285323
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001
[2003/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/00
[2003/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:FERNVERFAHRENSANRUF MIT SICHEREM NACHRICHTENDIENST IN EINER VERTEILTEN RECHNERUMGEBUNG[2003/09]
English:REMOTE METHOD INVOCATION WITH SECURE MESSAGING IN A DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING ENVIRONMENT[2003/09]
French:APPEL DE PROCEDE A DISTANCE AVEC MESSAGERIE SECURISEE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE REPARTI[2003/09]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2002National basic fee paid 
22.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.11.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/09]
26.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.12.2013Appeal received No.  T0703/14
14.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
10.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0456920  (IBM) [A] 1-68 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0969366  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [A] 1,25,45,49,55,59 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0965917  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC) [A] 1-5,25-28,45,46,52,59-62 * the whole document *;
 [YA]  - P. ERONEN ET AL, "Extending Jini with decentralized trust management", SHORT PAPER PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD IEEE CONFERENCE ON OPEN ARCHITECTURES AND NETWORK PROGRAMMING, Tel Aviv, Israël, (200003), pages 25 - 29, XP002214573 [Y] 1-5,21-23,25-28,41-46,48-52,54,59-62,67,68 * the whole document * [A] 6-20,24,29-40,47,53,55-58,63-66
 [YA]  - CZERWINSKI S E ET AL, "AN ARCHITECTURE FOR A SECURE SERVICE DISCOVERY SERVICE", MOBICOM '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING. SEATTLE, WA, AUG. 15 - 20, 1999, ANNUAL ACM/IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, NEW YORK, NY: ACM, US, (19990815), vol. CONF. 5, ISBN 1-58113-142-9, pages 24 - 35, XP000896069 [Y] 1-5,21-23,25-28,41-46,48-52,54,59-62,67,68 * page 24, column R, line 1 - page 33, column R, line 46; figure 1 * [A] 6-20,24,29-40,47,53,55-58,63-66

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/313451.313462
 [A]  - K EDWARDS, Core Jini, 1ST EDITION, PRENTICE HALL PTR, (199906), XP002212109 [A] 18,19,38,39,47,53,55,66 * page 636, line 1 - page 637, line 7 * * page 651, line 3 - page 657, line L *