Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1296698

EP1296698 - Therapeutic agents for the treatment of infections [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/14]THERAPEUTIC AGENTS - II
[2014/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEO LABORATORIES LIMITED
285 Cashel Road
Crumlin
Dublin 2 / IE
[2015/03]
Former [2013/25]For all designated states
LEO LABORATORIES LIMITED
285 Cashel Road
Crumlin
Dublin 2 / IE
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Peplin Research Pty Ltd
Ground Floor, South Tower, 527 Gregory Terrace
Bowen Hills, QLD 4006 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / AYLWARD, James, Harrison
14 Marston Avenue
Indooroopilly, QLD 4068 / AU
02 / PARSONS, Peter, Gordon
317 Swann Road
St Lucia, QLD 4067 / AU
03 / SUHRBIER, Andreas
185 Mailmans Track
Bunya, QLD 4055 / AU
04 / TURNER, Kathleen, Anne
13 Reema Boulevard
Endeavour Hills, VIC 3802 / AU
 [2003/14]
Representative(s)Jensen, Dorte Kold , et al
Leo Pharma A/S
Patents
Industriparken 55
2750 Ballerup / DK
[2014/42]
Former [2014/16](deleted)
...
Former [2003/14]Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date01937873.607.06.2001
[2003/14]
WO2001AU00680
Priority number, dateAU2000PQ0801707.06.2000         Original published format: AU PQ801700
[2003/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0193885
Date:13.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1296698
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1296698
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU13.12.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61P29/00, A61K31/455, A61K31/22, A61P31/02, G06F19/00, A61P31/18, A61K36/47, A61P31/04, A61P33/10
[2014/35]
Former International [2003/14]A61K35/78, A61K31/455, A61K31/22, A61P31/02, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/14]
TitleGerman:Therapeutische Verbindungen zur Behandlung von Infektionen[2014/35]
English:Therapeutic agents for the treatment of infections[2014/35]
French:Agents thérapeutiques pour le traitement des infections[2014/35]
Former [2003/14]THERAPEUTISCHE VERBINDUNGEN
Former [2003/14]THERAPEUTIC AGENTS - II
Former [2003/14]AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES - II
Entry into regional phase24.12.2002National basic fee paid 
24.12.2002Search fee paid 
24.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.11.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
24.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/14]
06.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2011Observations by third parties
08.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2014Fee for grant paid
05.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.05.2008
Opposition(s)15.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
18.12.2013Request for further processing filed
18.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.01.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
26.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
IE07.06.2015
LU07.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
[2018/34]
Former [2017/40]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
IE07.06.2015
LU07.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/24]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
IE07.06.2015
LU07.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/22]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
IE07.06.2015
LU07.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
IE07.06.2015
LU07.06.2015
Former [2016/11]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
LU07.06.2015
Former [2016/09]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2016/03]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
IT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/39]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/37]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/36]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
Former [2015/33]ES14.01.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]  - AITKEN A, "THE ACTIVATION OF PROTEIN KINASE C BY DAPHNANE INGENANE AND TIGLIANE DITERPENOID ESTERS", BOTANICAL JOURNAL OF THE LINNEAN SOCIETY, & JOINT MEETING OF THE LINNEAN SOCIETY AND THE PHYTOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, KEW, ENGLAND, UK, APRIL 1986. BO, (1987), vol. 94, no. 1-2, ISSN 0024-4074, pages 247 - 264, XP008040869 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - EL-MEKKAWY S ET AL, "Anti-HIV-1 phorbol esters from the seeds of Croton tiglium", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (20000209), vol. 53, no. 4, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 457 - 464, XP004291324 [X] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(99)00556-7
International search[X]WO9908994  ;
 [X]  - HOMANN J. ET AL., "Jatrophane diterpenoids from euphorbia peplus", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 51, pages 673 - 677, XP002986683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(99)00088-6
 [X]  - HOMANN J. ET AL., "Diterpenoids from Euphorbia peplus", PLANTA MEDICA, (2000), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 291 - 294, XP008016958

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2000-8568
Examination   - OGBOURNE S M ET AL, "Proceedings of the First International Conference on PEP005", ANTI-CANCER DRUGS, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US; NL, (20070301), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1097/CAD.0B013E3280149EC5, ISSN 0959-4973, pages 357 - 362, XP008124412

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CAD.0b013e3280149ec5
    - "Patoladi Curna", TKDL,, (20030101), XP003028010
    - "Tadbeer-e-Hab-ul-Mulook", TKDL,, (19300101), XP003028009
    - "Harpa-rewadi", TKDL,, (19260101), XP003028007
    - "Sankara Kiranikku Kudineer", TKDL, XP003028008
    - "Danti Dravanti Guna", TKDL,, (19790101), XP003028005
    - "Dravanti Guna", TKDL,, (19980101), XP003028017
    - "Kuppi", TKDL,, (18990101), XP003028006
    - "Linga Chenduram-20", TKDL,, (19750101), XP003028016
    - "Vathathirku Ennai", TKDL, XP003028015
    - "Paranghi Choornam", TKDL,, (19560101), XP003028014
    - "Velli Mezhugu", TKDL,, (19750101), XP003028013
    - "Thalaka Mezhugu-3", TKDL,, (19750101), XP003028012
    - "Vathakaduppukku Vethu", TKDL,, (18790101), XP003028011
other   - "Danti Dravanti Guna", TKDL, Database accession no. RS6/363, XP003028005
    - KAIYADEVA, Kaiyadevanighantau, (1979), page 187
    - "Kuppi", TKDL, Database accession no. FA1/62A, XP003028006
    - MOHAMMAD AZAM KHAN, Muheet-e-Azam, (1899), pages 32 - 33
    - "Harpa-rewadi", TKDL, Database accession no. JA6/1022, XP003028007
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1926), page 1034
    - "Sankara Kiranikku Kudineer", TKDL, Database accession no. GP02/298, XP003028008
    - YUGI, Vaithya Chinthamani, page 183
    - "Tadbeer-e-Hab-ul-Mulook", TKDL, Database accession no. NA3/1295A, XP003028009
    - KAREEM BAKHSH, Miftaah-al-Khazaain, (1930), pages 579 - 580
    - "Patoladi Curna", TKDL, Database accession no. AK10/498, XP003028010
    - TRIMALLA BHATTA, Yogatrangini, (2003), pages 222 - 223
    - "Vathakaduppukku Vethu", TKDL, Database accession no. AM05/1311, XP003028011
    - KANDASAMY MUDALIAR, Athmarakshaamirtham, (1879), page 359
    - "Thalaka Mezhugu-3", TKDL, Database accession no. GR03/180, XP003028012
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, Anuboga Vaithiya Navaneetham, (1975), page 129
    - "Velli Mezhugu", TKDL, Database accession no. PD01/106, XP003028013
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, Anuboga Vaithiya Navaneetham, (1975), page 123
    - "Paranghi Choornam", TKDL, Database accession no. SK03/77, XP003028014
    - KANNUSAMY PILLAI, Chikithsa Rathna Deepam, (1956), pages 111 - 112
    - "Vathathirku Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. VC02/31A, XP003028015
    - BRAMAMUNI, Bramamuni karukkadai, page 34
    - "Linga Chenduram-20", TKDL, Database accession no. GR05/69, XP003028016
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, Anuboga Vaithiya Navaneetham, (1975), pages 51 - 52
    - "Dravanti Guna", TKDL, Database accession no. RS8/183, XP003028017
    - PANDITA NARAHARI, Rajanighantauh, (1998), page 131