Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319443

EP1319443 - PORTABLE PAINT BOOTH USED FOR THE REPAIR OF AUTOMOBILE BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2005
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 27.06.2007  [2007/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gonzalez Urdiales, Luis Miguel
C/ Gardenia, 12 2 D
28803 Alcala de Henares (Madrid) / ES
[N/P]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
Gonzalez Urdiales, Luis Miguel
Gardenia 12
28803 Alcala de Henares / ES
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Gonzalez Urdiales, Luis Miguel
Gardenia 12
28803 Alcala de Henares / ES
For all designated states
Diaz Martin, Julian
Gardenia 12
28803 ALcala de Henares / ES
Inventor(s)01 / Gonzalez Urdiales, Luis Miguel
C/ Gardenia 12, 2 D
28803 Alcala de Henares / ES
02 / Diaz Martin, Julian
C/ Gardenia, 12
28803 Alcala de Henares / ES
 [2005/02]
Former [2003/25]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Munoz Garcia, Antonio
Miguel Angel, 16, 2
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Munoz Garcia, Antonio
C/ Doctor Fleming, 24 - 1 A
28036 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date01938272.005.06.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001ES00232
Priority number, dateES2000000147212.06.2000         Original published format: ES 200001472
[2003/25]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0196033
Date:20.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1319443
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319443
Date:15.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES20.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:B05B15/12
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGBARE LACKIERKABINE ZUR REPARATUR VON FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIEN[2003/25]
English:PORTABLE PAINT BOOTH USED FOR THE REPAIR OF AUTOMOBILE BODIES[2003/25]
French:CABINE DE PEINTURE PORTABLE POUVANT ETRE UTILISEE DANS LA REPARATION DES CARROSSERIES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2002Translation filed 
12.12.2002National basic fee paid 
12.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/25]
18.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.03.2004Fee for grant paid
01.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
CY05.06.2005
LU05.06.2005
[2007/26]
Former [2007/20]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
CY05.06.2005
Former [2006/51]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
TR15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/46]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
DK15.12.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/27]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
ES26.12.2004
Former [2005/21]CH15.09.2004
LI15.09.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]US5236506  (MAZAKAS RUSSELL [US]);
 [A]US4662309  (MULDER DOUGLAS C [US]);
 [A]US4590884  (KREEGER KEN [US], et al);
 [A]EP0144124  (NORDSON CORP [US]);
 [A]US5162132  (DIAZ WILLIAM [US])