Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1198775

EP1198775 - METHOD FOR ACQUIRING AND PROCESSING DATA OF BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.10.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schellmann, Johannes
Rabenhorst 29
22391 Hamburg / DE
For all designated states
Schellmann, Hartmut
Rabenhorst 29
22391 Hamburg / DE
[2002/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/17]
Representative(s)Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/46]Zenz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2
45128 Essen / DE
Former [2002/17]Schmidt, Frank-Michael, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner, Patentanwälte, Huyssenallee 58-64
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date01940286.604.04.2001
[2002/17]
WO2001EP03844
Priority number, dateDE2000101771010.04.2000         Original published format: DE 10017710
[2002/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0177914
Date:18.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1198775
Date:24.04.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2001
[2002/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2002/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ERFASSEN UND VERARBEITEN VON DATEN VON GESCHÄFTSVORFÄLLEN[2002/17]
English:METHOD FOR ACQUIRING AND PROCESSING DATA OF BUSINESS TRANSACTIONS[2002/17]
French:PROCEDE D'ACQUISITION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES DE TRANSACTIONS COMMERCIALES[2002/17]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2001National basic fee paid 
22.12.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/17]
01.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2014
24.10.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
26.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0744/15
01.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
03.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
02.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
02.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200404   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2004