blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1277351

EP1277351 - CAMERA WITH COLOR FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2007/31]
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JASPERS, Cornelis, A., M.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2003/04]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al
Page White & Farrer Limited
Bedford House
21A John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]Birchenough, Lewis, et al
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2007/01]White, Andrew Gordon, et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [2003/04]Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date01940323.712.04.2001
[2003/04]
WO2001EP04189
Priority number, dateEP2000020148720.04.2000         Original published format: EP 00201487
[2003/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0182631
Date:01.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1277351
Date:22.01.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1277351
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N9/04
[2003/04]
CPC:
H04N25/136 (EP,US); H04N9/64 (KR); H04N25/134 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KAMERA MIT FARBFILTER[2003/04]
English:CAMERA WITH COLOR FILTER[2003/04]
French:CAMERA DOTEE D'UN FILTRE DE COULEUR[2003/04]
Entry into regional phase20.11.2002National basic fee paid 
20.11.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.11.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
11.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.2008Fee for grant paid
16.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
CY03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
IT03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
TR03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
IE12.04.2009
LU12.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
IT03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
IE12.04.2009
LU12.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2011/14]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
IT03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
IE12.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2010/47]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
GR04.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
IE12.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2010/21]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
IE12.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2010/08]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2009/46]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
DK03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2009/40]AT03.12.2008
BE03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2009/37]BE03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
SE03.03.2009
ES14.03.2009
PT04.05.2009
Former [2009/32]BE03.12.2008
FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
ES14.03.2009
Former [2009/25]FI03.12.2008
NL03.12.2008
ES14.03.2009
Former [2009/20]ES14.03.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH10327354  ;
 [A]US5604530  (SAITO KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 7 *;
 [A]WO9819270  (STUTTGART MIKROELEKTRONIK [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0930789  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6046772  (HOWELL PAUL [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 5 *;
 [PA]WO0113649  (YMEDIA CORP [US], et al) [PA] 1-6* figure 10 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10327354 A 19981208 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 2-4 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.