Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1316291

EP1316291 - GREAT SAPHENOUS VEIN VARIX TREATMENT TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TSUKADA MEDICAL RESEARCH CO., LTD.
8-12-501, Kitashinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 169-0074 / JP
[2007/31]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
TSUKADA MEDICAL RESEARCH CO., LTD.
8-12-501, Kitashinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 169-0074 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KATSUMOTO, Keiichiro
1-6-3, Asagaya minami
Suginami-ku, Tokyo 166-0004 / JP
02 / YOKOKURA, Tadashi
8-3, Tobio 2-chome
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0204 / JP
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Makovski, Priscilla Mary
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Makovski, Priscilla Mary
BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date01941203.025.06.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001JP05390
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03000143
Date:03.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1316291
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1316291
Date:01.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/12, A61B19/02, A61M25/00, A61K9/70
[2005/51]
Former International [2003/23]A61B17/12, A61B19/02, A61M25/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2007/31]
Former [2003/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNGSINSTRUMENT FÜR VARIZEN DER SAPHENUSVENE[2007/08]
English:GREAT SAPHENOUS VEIN VARIX TREATMENT TOOL[2003/23]
French:INSTRUMENT DE TRAITEMENT DES VARICES DE LA VEINE SAPHENE INTERNE[2003/23]
Former [2003/23]BEHANDLUNGSSINSTRUMENT FÜR VARIZEN DER SAPHENUSVENE
Entry into regional phase26.03.2003Translation filed 
27.03.2003National basic fee paid 
27.03.2003Search fee paid 
27.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
31.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2007Fee for grant paid
07.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
16.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR28.03.2008
[2008/32]
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]EP0882428  (APPLIED VASCULAR ENG INC [US]);
 [A]JP2000281144  (TERUMO CORP);
 [A]JP2001058009  (USAMI NANO TECHNOLOGY KK)