Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257321

EP1257321 - PERMANENTLY IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/47]PERMANENTLY IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE
[2008/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.05.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8700 Beverly Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Cedars-Sinai Medical Center
8700 Beverley Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90036 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EIGLER, Neil, L.
459 Surfview Drive
Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US
02 / WHITING, James, S., Ph. D.
3318 Mountain View Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90066-1930 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Fennell, Gareth Charles
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]Fennell, Gareth Charles
D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2002/47]Mather, Belinda , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date01942315.109.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001US00889
Priority number, dateUS2000048108411.01.2000         Original published format: US 481084
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0151123
Date:19.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257321
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257321
Date:23.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/365
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:PERMANENT IMPLANTIERBARES SYSTEM ZUR DETEKTION, DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON ANGEBOREN HERZFEHLERN[2008/09]
English:PERMANENTLY IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE[2008/09]
French:SYSTEME IMPLANTABLE PERMANENT PERMETTANT DE DETECTER, DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE TRAITER L'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE CONGESTIVE[2008/09]
Former [2002/47]PERMANENT IMPLANTIERBARES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION, DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON HERZINFARKT
Former [2002/47]PERMANENTLY IMPLANTABLE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING, DIAGNOSING AND TREATING CONGESTIVE HEART FAILURE
Former [2002/47]SYSTEME IMPLANTABLE PERMANENT ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETECTER, DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE TRAITER L'INSUFFISANCE CARDIAQUE CONGESTIVE
Entry into regional phase09.08.2002National basic fee paid 
09.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.08.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.08.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
13.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2008Fee for grant paid
29.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.04.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
CY23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
TR23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
LU09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
LU09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/47]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
GR24.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/09]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
SE23.10.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/07]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
IE09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2010/01]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
GB09.01.2009
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/37]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
MC31.01.2009
Former [2009/19]AT23.07.2008
BE23.07.2008
DK23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/15]AT23.07.2008
FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/12]FI23.07.2008
NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Former [2009/09]NL23.07.2008
ES03.11.2008
PT23.12.2008
Cited inInternational search[YA]US5163429  (COHEN TODD J [US]) [Y] 1-3,10-28 * column 8, line 15 - column 10, line 15 * * column 11, lines 25-60; figures 1-4 * [A] 8;
 [Y]US5752976  (DUFFIN EDWIN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,10-28 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 39 * * column 9, line 21 - column 11, line 5 * * column 13, line 35 - column 15, line 6; figures 1-3,5,6 *;
 [A]WO9611722  (AEL IND INC [US]) [A] 1-3,10-28 * pages 4-5 * * page 10, line 26 - page 12, line 7; figures 1,2,5A *;
 [A]EP0472411  (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-3,10-28 * column 18, lines 3-20 * * column 24, line 26 - column 26, line 26; figures 6-12 *;
 [A]WO9956812  (ATRIONIX INC [US]) [A] 4-9 * page 20, line 23 - page 21, line 10 *;
 [PY]EP1050265  (TRICARDIA LLC [US]) [PY] 1-28 * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0066]; figures 1-5,12 *;
 [PY]EP1057448  (BARDY GUST H [US]) [PY] 1-28 * the whole document *