Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1252162

EP1252162 - ALPHA V INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2013
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
Schering Corporation
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065 / US
Former [2002/44]For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUGGAN, Mark, E.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
02 / HALCZENKO, Wasyl
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
03 / HUTCHINSON, John, H.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
04 / LI, Aiwen
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
05 / MEISSNER, Robert, S.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
06 / PERKINS, James, J.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
07 / STEELE, Thomas, G.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
08 / WANG, Jiabing
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
09 / PATANE, Michael, A.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
 [2002/44]
Representative(s)Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc.
European Patent Department
Merck Sharpe & Dohme Limited
Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/30]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharpe & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2006/48]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon
Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB
Former [2004/27]Horgan, James Michael Frederic , et al
Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Former [2002/44]Cole, William Gwyn , et al
European Patent Department, Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road
Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB
Application number, filing date01942625.316.01.2001
[2002/44]
WO2001US01298
Priority number, dateUS20000177168P20.01.2000         Original published format: US 177168 P
[2002/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0153297
Date:26.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1252162
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2001
[2002/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1252162
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.07.2001
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/444, A61K31/4166, A61P19/10, A61K31/4178, C07D471/04, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D471/10
[2003/11]
Former International [2002/44]C07D471/04, C07D401/06, A61K31/4375, A61K31/444
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/44]
Extension statesAL20.08.2002
LT20.08.2002
LV20.08.2002
MK20.08.2002
RO20.08.2002
SI20.08.2002
TitleGerman:ALPHA V INTEGRIN REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN[2002/44]
English:ALPHA V INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2002/44]
French:ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE L'INTEGRINE ALPHA V[2002/44]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2002National basic fee paid 
20.08.2002Search fee paid 
20.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/44]
12.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2012Fee for grant paid
12.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2008
Opposition(s)26.04.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
TR25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
GB16.01.2013
IE16.01.2013
LU16.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
TR25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
GB16.01.2013
IE16.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2014/07]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
GB16.01.2013
IE16.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/51]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
GB16.01.2013
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/50]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
FR31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/48]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
CH31.01.2013
LI31.01.2013
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
MC31.01.2013
Former [2013/23]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
IT25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
ES05.11.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/21]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
DK25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/15]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
NL25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/13]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
PT26.11.2012
Former [2013/12]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
SE25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
Former [2013/11]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
GR26.10.2012
Former [2013/10]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
CY25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
Former [2013/09]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
FI25.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT25.07.2012
BE25.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT25.07.2012
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO9931099  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-23 * example 20-14, p. 144;; claims 1,4,29-44 *;
 [A]WO9818461  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim 1 *
International search[XP]US6017926  (ASKEW BEN C [US], et al);
 [XP]US6066648  (DUGGAN MARK E [US], et al)
by applicantWO9613523
 US5501969
    - THE WALL STREET JOURNAL, (19991203), page B1,
    - KOSHELNICK ET AL., "Mechanisms of signaling through Urokinase Receptor and the Cellular Response", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1999), vol. 82, pages 305 - 311,
    - F. BLASI, "Proteolysis, Cell Adhesion, Chemotaxis, and Invasiveness Are Regulated by the u-PA-u-PAR-PAI-1 System", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1999), vol. 82, pages 298 - 304,
    - H.N. LODE, PNAS USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 1591 - 1596,
    - C. FARINA ET AL., "Selective inhibitors of the osteoclast vacuolar proton ATPase as novel bone antiresorptive agents", DDT, (1999), vol. 4, pages 163 - 172,