Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1290290

EP1290290 - FLOOR COVERING, FLOOR PANELS, METHOD FOR THEIR REALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  03.11.2015
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE
published on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
Z.I. Bourmicht 10b Rue des Mérovingiens
8070 Bertrange / LU
[2015/42]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Flooring Industries Ltd.
West Block, IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Former [2003/11]For all designated states
Flooring Industries Ltd.
West Block, IFSC
Dublin 1 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / THIERS, Bernard, Paul, Joseph
Nestor de Tièrestraat 128
B-9700 Eine / BE
 [2008/45]
Former [2003/11]01 / THIERS, Bernard, Paul, Joseph
Stationsstraat 134
B-8780 Oostrozebeke / BE
Representative(s)Hammond, Andrew David , et al
Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Gothenburg / SE
[2015/49]
Former [2011/02]Hammond, Andrew David , et al
Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2009/01]Donné, Eddy , et al
M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Anvers / BE
Former [2003/11]Donné, Eddy
M.F.J.Bockstael Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Anvers / BE
Application number, filing date01942918.212.06.2001
[2003/11]
WO2001BE00097
Priority number, dateBE2000000038113.06.2000         Original published format: BE 200000381
[2003/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0196689
Date:20.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1290290
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.12.2001
[2003/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1290290
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1290290
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/04, B44F9/02, B44C5/04, B44C1/24
[2003/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/49]
Former [2003/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:BODENBELAG, FUSSBODENPLATTEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2003/11]
English:FLOOR COVERING, FLOOR PANELS, METHOD FOR THEIR REALIZATION[2003/11]
French:REVETEMENT DE SOL, PANNEAUX ET LEUR PROCEDE DE REALISATION[2003/11]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2002National basic fee paid 
17.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/11]
28.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.2009Fee for grant paid
25.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09014454.4  / EP2149652
EP10010283.9  / EP2267240
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.10.2010  13.10.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hueck Rheinische GmbH
Helmholtz-Straße 9
41747 Viersen / DE
Opponent's representative
Burger, Hannes
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
 02  06.10.2010  23.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
DECOTEC PRINTING, S.A.U
Pol. Industrial Can Busca Sud., s.n.
08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2010  13.10.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hueck Rheinische GmbH
Helmholtz-Straße 9
41747 Viersen / DE
Opponent's representative
Burger, Hannes
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
 02  06.10.2010  23.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
DECOTEC PRINTING, S.A.U
Pol. Industrial Can Busca Sud., s.n.
08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Röthinger, Rainer
c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Former [2012/40]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2010  13.10.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hueck Rheinische GmbH
Helmholtz-Straße 9
41747 Viersen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried
Demski, Frank & Nobbe
Patentanwälte
Tonhallenstraße 16
47051 Duisburg / DE
 02  06.10.2010  23.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
DECOTEC PRINTING, S.A.U
Pol. Industrial Can Busca Sud., s.n.
08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Röthinger, Rainer
c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Former [2010/46]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2010  13.10.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Hueck Rheinische GmbH
Helmholtz-Straße 9
41747 Viersen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried
Demski, Frank & Nobbe Patentanwälte Tonhallenstraße 16
D-47051 Duisburg / DE
 02  06.10.2010  13.10.2010  ADMISSIBLE
DECOTEC PRINTING, S.A.U
Pol. Industrial Can Busca Sud., s.n.
08490 Tordera Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Röthinger, Rainer
c/o Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Former [2010/45]
Opponent(s)01  05.10.2010   
Hueck Rheinische GmbH
Helmholtz-Straße 9
41747 Viersen / DE
Opponent's representative
Demski, Siegfried
Demski, Frank & Nobbe Patentanwälte Tonhallenstraße 16
D-47051 Duisburg / DE
11.11.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.03.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.03.2011Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
19.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.09.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition04.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0270/13
19.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
10.04.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
16.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
20.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
MC30.06.2010
[2017/41]
Former [2017/03]BE06.01.2010
CY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/32]CY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/14]CY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
IT12.06.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2011/07]CY06.01.2010
DK06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
MC30.06.2010
Former [2010/47]CY06.01.2010
GR07.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US4237087  (JONES DONALD B) [A] 1-5,7-14,16 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 64; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]US5804285  (KOBAYASHI TOSHITAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7,8,10,12-16 * column 3, line 14 - column 8, line 40; figures 1-12D; example 1 *
ExaminationWO0148333
 WO9731776
 WO9747834
 US4092199
 US4367110
OppositionDE3210950
 WO9731775
 EP0088215
 DE69713572T
 US3373068
 WO9106427
 EP1229183