Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1383881

EP1383881 - LIPOLYTIC ENZYMES FROM STRAINS OF FUSARIUM AND ACREMONIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.06.2009
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes Biotech, Inc.
1445 Drew Avenue
Davis, CA 95616 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
For all designated states
Novozymes Biotech, Inc.
1445 Drew Avenue
Davis, CA 95616 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TSUTSUMI, Noriko
3-2-16, Higashisugano
Ishikawa, Chiba 272 / JP
02 / SASAKI, Yukiko
2-26-1 Kitakata
Ishikawa, Chiba 273-0035 / JP
03 / REY, Michael, W.
605 Robin Place
Davis, CA 95616 / US
04 / ZARETSKY, Elizabeth
1114 Colina Ct.
Davis, CA 95616 / US
05 / SPENDLER, Tina
Hjortespringparken 40
DK-2730 Herlev / DK
06 / VIND, Jesper
Hejrebakke 20
DK-3500 Vaerloese / DK
 [2004/05]
Representative(s)Knudsen, Sten Lottrup , et al
Novozymes A/S
Patents
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2004/05]Knudsen, Sten Lottrup , et al
Novozymes A/S, Patents, Krogshojvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date01944983.426.06.2001
[2004/05]
WO2001DK00448
Priority number, dateDK2000000098926.06.2000         Original published format: DK 200000989
DK2000000099026.06.2000         Original published format: DK 200000990
DK2000000099126.06.2000         Original published format: DK 200000991
DK2000000117204.08.2000         Original published format: DK 200001172
US2000070341631.10.2000         Original published format: US 703416
US2000070341431.10.2000         Original published format: US 703414
DK2001000084325.05.2001         Original published format: DK 200100843
[2004/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0200852
Date:03.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1383881
Date:28.01.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002
[2004/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/20, C07K14/37, A21D8/04, A21D10/00, C11D3/386
[2004/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/05]
TitleGerman:LIPOLYTISCHE ENZYME AUS FUSARIUM UND ACREMONIUM STÄMMEN[2004/05]
English:LIPOLYTIC ENZYMES FROM STRAINS OF FUSARIUM AND ACREMONIUM[2004/05]
French:LIPASE[2004/05]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase27.01.2003National basic fee paid 
21.05.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.05.2004Examination requested  [2004/30]
02.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/31]
03.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/31]
10.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP09154132.6  / EP2119773
EP10177946.0  / EP2281878
EP10177949.4  / EP2287296
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.12.2007Request for further processing filed
19.12.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.01.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
30.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9826057  (NOVONORDISK AS) [X] 1-4,6-16 * especially SEQ. ID. No.1 & 2; page 45 - page 49 *;
 [X]WO9953001  (NOVO NORDISK AS) [X] 1-4,6-13 * especially SEQ. ID. No.1 *;
 [A]WO0028044  (NOVO NORDISK BIOINDUSTRY LTD ;NOVO NORDISK BIOTECH INC (US)) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
    [ ] - GSN, (19981026), Database accession no. AAV074024, URL: EMBL, XP002902179 [ ] * 76,094% identity with SEQ. ID. No.1 in 891 nt overlap *
    [ ] - GSP, (19981026), Database accession no. AAW51765, URL: EMBL, XP002902180 [ ] * 82,075% identity with SEQ. ID. No.2 in 318 aa overlap *
    [ ] - GSP, (20000117), Database accession no. AAY32085, URL: EMBL, XP002902181 [ ] * 82,075% identity with SEQ.ID. No.2 in 318 aa overlap *
 [X]  - NAGAO T ET AL, "Cloning and nucleotide sequence of cDNA encoding a lipase from fusarium heterosporum", J. BIOCHEM, vol. 116, no. 3, (199409), Database accession no. Q02351, pages 536 - 540, URL: EMBL, XP002902184 [X] 1-4,6-13 * the whole document *
    [ ] - EM-FUN, (19951031), Database accession no. S77816, URL: EMBL, XP002902182 [ ] * 64,768% identity with SEQ. ID. No.1 in 667 nt overlap *
    [ ] - SWALL, (19961101), Database accession no. Q02351, URL: EMBL, XP002902183 [ ] * 57,372% identity with SEQ. ID. No.2 in 312 aa overlap *