Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1242705

EP1242705 - TOOL FOR RELEASING A LOCKING CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wendt, Adalbert
Sonnenhang 17
50127 Bergheim / DE
[2002/39]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Maxton Langmaack & Partner
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/39]Patentanwälte Maxton & Langmaack
Postfach 51 08 06
D-50944 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date01945210.130.05.2001
[2002/39]
WO2001EP06122
Priority number, dateDE2000216866U30.09.2000         Original published format: DE 20016866 U
[2002/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0229185
Date:11.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1242705
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1242705
Date:19.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:E05B19/20
[2002/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/39]
TitleGerman:WERKZEUG ZUM ENTSPERREN EINES SCHLIESSZYLINDERS[2002/39]
English:TOOL FOR RELEASING A LOCKING CYLINDER[2002/39]
French:OUTIL POUR DEBLOQUER UN CYLINDRE DE FERMETURE[2002/39]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2002National basic fee paid 
11.06.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
05.08.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
27.01.2004Fee for grant paid
27.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.03.2004Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
01.04.2004Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200303   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY19.05.2004
FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
IT19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
PT19.10.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/36]CY19.05.2004
FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
IT19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2007/10]CY19.05.2004
FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2006/51]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
TR19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2006/13]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/28]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
BE31.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/23]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
LU30.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/19]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI19.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/11]FI19.05.2004
MC31.05.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI19.05.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI19.05.2004
SE19.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE19.08.2004
Cited inInternational search[PX]US6134928  (KANG SAMUEL [KR]) [PX] 1 * column W *;
 [X]DE19849874  (GRENNINGLOH FRIEDER [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29808888U  (NOCH KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *