Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320838

EP1320838 - SET FOR AUTOMATICALLY READING AN INFORMATION AND FOR REMOTE CONTROL OR MONITORING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST SUCH A SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.06.2006
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bouygues Telecom
20, quai du Point du Jour
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / MASCLET, Sophie
3, rue des Fontaines
F-92310 Sevres / FR
02 / GAILLOTTE, Nicolas
7, avenue René David
F-94100 Saint-Maur-des-Fosses / FR
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert
Cabinet Regimbeau
20 Rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]Callon de Lamarck, Jean-Robert
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date01947566.421.06.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001FR01953
Priority number, dateFR2000000800022.06.2000         Original published format: FR 0008000
[2003/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0199066
Date:27.12.2001
Language:FR
[2001/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320838
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320838
Date:17.08.2005
Language:FR
[2005/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/24, G07C1/30, G07B15/00
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN LESEN EINER INFORMATION UND SYSTEM ZUR KONTROLLE UND ZUR FERNÜBERWACHUNG MIT MINDESTENS EINER SOLCHEN ANORDNUNG[2003/26]
English:SET FOR AUTOMATICALLY READING AN INFORMATION AND FOR REMOTE CONTROL OR MONITORING SYSTEM COMPRISING AT LEAST SUCH A SET[2003/26]
French:ENSEMBLE PERMETTANT DE LIRE AUTOMATIQUEMENT UNE INFORMATION ET SYSTEME DE CONTROLE OU DE SUIVI A DISTANCE COMPORTANT AU MOINS UN TEL ENSEMBLE[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2003National basic fee paid 
14.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
23.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2005Fee for grant paid
18.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipTR17.08.2005
[2009/42]
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5905247  (ILEN TERO [FI]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,12-16 * the whole document * [A] 4,11;
 [A]EP0940783  (KEYCORP LIMITED [AU]) [A] 1,4,5,9,11 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]WO9858510  (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 7, line 13 - page 10, line 20 *;
 [A]WO9948062  (MODUL SYSTEM SWEDEN AB [SE], et al);
 [A]WO9719568  (VAZVAN BEHRUZ [FI])