Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1407997

EP1407997 - ELEVATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.09.2012  [2012/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
[2006/18]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHITAMIYA, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / YOSHIKAWA, Masami, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
 [2011/42]
Former [2004/16]01 / SHITAMIYA, Koji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
02 / YOSHIKAWA, Masami, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K.
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/42]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2004/16]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date01948003.713.07.2001
[2004/16]
WO2001JP06079
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03008321
Date:30.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1407997
Date:14.04.2004
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2003
[2004/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1407997
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:B66B11/08, B66B7/06
[2004/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2011/20]
Former [2004/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:HUBVORRICHTUNG[2004/16]
English:ELEVATOR DEVICE[2004/16]
French:ELEVATEUR[2004/16]
Entry into regional phase11.04.2003Translation filed 
11.04.2003National basic fee paid 
11.04.2003Search fee paid 
11.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
11.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2003Examination requested  [2004/16]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2011Fee for grant paid
06.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.04.2010
Opposition(s)20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
17.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
16.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL19.10.2011
[2012/24]
Documents cited:Search[XA]JPH08337372  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [A] 2-4
International search[A]JPH07237853  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC BILL TECH);
 [A]JP2000046137  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPH07305277  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [A]JP2000118914  (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD);
 [A]JPH08217366  (HITACHI LTD);
 [A]JPH0393573  (CANON KK)
by applicantJPH08337372