Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1296587

EP1296587 - ANALYTE MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.10.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intuity Medical, Inc.
526 Almanor Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
[2017/19]
Former [2011/44]For all designated states
Intuity Medical, Inc.
350 Potrero Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
Intuity Medical, Inc.
10161 Bubb Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Former [2005/42]For all designated states
Rosedale Medical, Inc.
10161 Bubb Road
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Rosedale Medical, Inc.
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Former [2003/14]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ACETI, John, Gregory
7 Monroe Drive
West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US
02 / LOEWY, Zvi, Gerald
4-50, Lyncrest Avenue
Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US
03 / MORONEY, Richard, Morgan, III
3 Kensington Court
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / GREGORY, Christopher, Carter
1321 Wrightstown Road
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
05 / ZANZUCCHI, Peter, John
13 Jill Drive
West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US
 [2003/25]
Former [2003/14]01 / ACETI, John, Gregory
7 Monroe Drive
Cranbury, NJ 08512 / US
02 / LOEWY, Zvi, Gerald
4-50, Lyncrest Avenue
Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US
03 / MORONEY, Richard, Morgan, III
3 Kensington Court
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
04 / GREGORY, Christopher, Carter
1321 Wrightstown Road
Newtown, PA 18940 / US
05 / ZANZUCCHI, Peter, John
13 Jill Drive
West Windsor, NJ 08550 / US
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Carter, Stephen John
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2005/42]Carter, Stephen John
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2003/14]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date01950550.227.06.2001
[2003/14]
WO2001US20447
Priority number, dateUS20000214334P27.06.2000         Original published format: US 214334 P
US2000074175520.12.2000         Original published format: US 741755
[2003/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0200101
Date:03.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1296587
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1296587
Date:09.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.01.2003
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00, A61B5/00, A61B5/15
[2005/25]
Former International [2003/14]A61B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/14]
TitleGerman:ANALYTÜBERWACHUNGSGERÄT[2003/14]
English:ANALYTE MONITOR[2003/14]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE D'ANALYTE[2003/14]
Entry into regional phase27.01.2003National basic fee paid 
27.01.2003Search fee paid 
27.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/14]
07.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2009Observations by third parties
29.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2011Fee for grant paid
26.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10181155.2  / EP2308365
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.12.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  10.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/26]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012  10.08.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Patentanwälte
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
Former [2012/36]
Opponent(s)01  01.08.2012   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Stößel, Matthias, et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner
Patentanwälte
Dudenstrasse 46
68167 Mannheim / DE
13.09.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition12.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0275/15
13.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
05.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0275/15
28.11.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
05.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
26.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
27.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200505   M06   Fee paid on   05.07.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
AT27.06.2014
FI27.06.2014
LU27.06.2014
ES28.06.2014
SE28.06.2014
BE30.06.2014
DK30.06.2014
[2017/41]
Former [2015/50]CY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
AT27.06.2014
FI27.06.2014
LU27.06.2014
ES28.06.2014
SE28.06.2014
DK30.06.2014
Former [2015/34]CY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
AT27.06.2014
FI27.06.2014
LU27.06.2014
SE28.06.2014
DK30.06.2014
Former [2015/25]CY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
AT27.06.2014
FI27.06.2014
LU27.06.2014
SE28.06.2014
Former [2015/09]CY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
FI27.06.2014
LU27.06.2014
SE28.06.2014
Former [2014/21]CY09.11.2011
TR09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
IE27.06.2012
MC30.06.2012
Former [2012/28]CY09.11.2011
GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
Former [2012/23]GR10.02.2012
PT09.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5971941  (SIMONS ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * column W * [A] 8;
 [Y]US5682233  (BRINDA ET AL) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 42 - column 8, line 41; figures 1,3,18 *;
 [Y]US4627445  (GARCIA ET AL) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 13; figures 4,5 *;
 [X]WO9743962  (MERCURY DIAGNOSTICS, INC) [X] 8 * column A * * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 12; figure 18 *;
 [X]US5807375  (GROSS ET AL) [X] 9-15 * column W *;
 [A]EP0849584  (DADE BEHRING MARBURG GMBH) [A] 1,6 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 15; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US6048352  (DOUGLAS ET AL) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 26 - column 8, line 47; figures 16,17 *
International search[A]US5458140  ;
 [A]US5801057  ;
 [AP]US6206841  ;
 [A]US5971941
otherUS6036924