Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319277

EP1319277 - METHOD FOR ALLOWING MULTI-USER ORTHOGONAL AND NON-ORTHOGONAL INTEROPERABILITY OF CODE CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IPR Licensing, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2014/35]
Former [2013/15]For all designated states
IPR Licensing, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
IPR Licensing, Inc.
300 Delaware Avenue Suite 527
Wilmington, DE 19801 / US
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Tantivy Communications, Inc.
1450 S. Babcock Street
Melbourne, FL 32901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PROCTOR, James, A., Jr.
258 Sea View Street
Melbourne Beach, FL 32951 / US
02 / ALAPURANEN, Pertti, Olavi
147 Dotted Dove Lane
Indialantic, FL 32903 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Badel, Xavier Claude Yves
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[2014/08]
Former [2007/13]Giver, Sören Bo , et al
Awapatent AB Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2003/25]Greenwood, John David , et al
Graham Watt & Co. St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
Application number, filing date01950941.306.07.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US21452
Priority number, dateUS20000219789P19.07.2000         Original published format: US 219789 P
US2001089851403.07.2001         Original published format: US 898514
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0209320
Date:31.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319277
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319277
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/16
[2014/07]
Former International [2003/25]H04B7/26, H04J13/02, H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSAMMENARBEIT MEHRER NUTZER VON ORTHOGONALEN UND NICHT-ORTHOGONALEN KODE-KANÄLEN[2003/25]
English:METHOD FOR ALLOWING MULTI-USER ORTHOGONAL AND NON-ORTHOGONAL INTEROPERABILITY OF CODE CHANNELS[2003/25]
French:PROCEDE D'INTEROPERABILITE ORTHOGONALE ET NON ORTHOGONALE A UTILISATEURS MULTIPLES DE CANAL DE CODE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase03.02.2003National basic fee paid 
03.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.01.2014
14.01.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2014Fee for grant paid
16.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14177362.2  / EP2827512
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2007
Opposition(s)28.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
[2017/46]
Former [2016/33]AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2016/13]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US5103459  (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [A] 1,24 * abstract * * column 31 - column 34 *