blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1346266

EP1346266 - ROBOT MOTION COMPENSATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2021Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 30.06.2021  [2021/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genmark Automation, Inc.
1213 Elko Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2003/39]
Inventor(s)01 / SOTIROV, Zlatko M.
1201 Cadillac Court
Milpitas, CA 95035 / US
02 / BONEV, Eugene, G.
1702 Loveland Court
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
 [2004/24]
Former [2003/39]01 / SOTIROV, Zlatko M.
815 East Fremont Avenue, No. 65
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / BONEV, Eugene, G.
1702 Loveland Court
Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US
Representative(s)Ahner, Philippe, et al
Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense
CS 60347
92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/09]Ahner, Philippe, et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Former [2013/13]Ahner, Philippe, et al
BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Former [2009/48]Poulin, Gérard
Brevalex 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2003/39]Poulin, Gérard
BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01951050.210.07.2001
[2003/39]
WO2001US21917
Priority number, dateUS2000063573209.08.2000         Original published format: US 635732
[2003/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0212970
Date:14.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1346266
Date:24.09.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1346266
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2011
ClassificationIPC:G05B19/10
[2003/39]
CPC:
B25J9/1615 (EP,US); B25J9/163 (EP,US); B25J9/1638 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39006 (EP,US); G05B2219/39176 (EP,US); G05B2219/39298 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40243 (EP,US); G05B2219/40296 (EP,US); G05B2219/40419 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45026 (EP,US); G05B2219/45056 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2019/09]
Former [2003/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:ROBOTER-BEWEGUNGSKOMPENSATIONSSYSTEM[2003/39]
English:ROBOT MOTION COMPENSATION SYSTEM[2003/39]
French:SYSTEME ROBOTIQUE DE COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT[2018/42]
Former [2003/39]SYST ME ROBOTIQUE DE COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT
Entry into regional phase21.02.2003National basic fee paid 
21.02.2003Search fee paid 
21.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.02.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/39]
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2019Fee for grant paid
17.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2016
Opposition(s)28.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
03.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
19.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
05.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 15
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
05.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 17
30.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200909   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2009
31.07.201414   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2014
31.07.201515   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2016
31.07.201717   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2018
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.02.2019
DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
TR27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
LU10.07.2019
BE31.07.2019
[2021/26]
Former [2020/26]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
TR27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
LU10.07.2019
BE31.07.2019
Former [2020/17]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
TR27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2020/14]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
MC27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK27.02.2019
ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES27.02.2019
FI27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
GR28.05.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI27.02.2019
SE27.02.2019
PT27.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI27.02.2019
PT27.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0011527  (GENMARK AUTOMATION INC [US]) [Y] 2,4,6,9,13,16-19 * abstract * * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 13 ** page 10, line 1 - line 25 *;
 [IY]JP2000183128  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [I] 1,3,5,7,8,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] * * paragraphs [0080] , [0081] * [Y] 2,4,6,9,13,16-19
International search[Y]US5789890  (GENOV GENCO [US], et al);
 [YP]US6126381  (BACCHI PAUL [US], et al)
by applicantJP2000183128
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.