Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1411869

EP1411869 - ARTIFICIAL JOINT PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/18]ARTIFICIAL SOCKET
[2004/47]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kuoni, Xaver
Alter Zürichweg 33
CH-8952 Schlieren / CH
[2004/18]
Inventor(s)01 / KUONI, Xaver
Alter Zürichweg 33
CH-8952 Schlieren / CH
02 / HOFER, Hannes
Dossenweg 26
A-5020 Salzburg / AT
 [2004/18]
Representative(s)Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
Postfach
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792
8022 Zürich / CH
Former [2005/19]Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte
Beethovenstrasse 49
8039 Zürich / CH
Former [2004/18]Patentanwälte Feldmann & Partner AG
Postfach Europastrasse 17
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date01951306.831.07.2001
[2004/18]
WO2001CH00466
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO03011196
Date:13.02.2003
Language:DE
[2003/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1411869
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003
[2004/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1411869
Date:18.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34
[2004/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜNSTLICHE GELENKPFANNE[2004/18]
English:ARTIFICIAL JOINT PROSTHESIS[2004/47]
French:PROTHESE D'ARTICULATION ARTIFICIEL[2004/47]
Former [2004/18]ARTIFICIAL SOCKET
Former [2004/18]COTYLE ARTIFICIEL
Entry into regional phase09.01.2004National basic fee paid 
09.01.2004Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2004Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
01.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.03.2005Fee for grant paid
17.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.05.2005
FR18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
TR18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
CY31.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
[2008/52]
Former [2008/45]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
TR18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
CY31.07.2005
FR31.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2007/20]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
TR18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
CY31.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2007/10]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
TR18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
LU31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/51]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
TR18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/36]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
BE31.07.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/28]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
MC31.07.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/23]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
IE18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/22]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
NL18.05.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/14]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
DK18.08.2005
GR18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
ES29.08.2005
PT24.10.2005
Former [2006/13]FI18.05.2005
GB18.05.2005
DK18.08.2005
SE18.08.2005
Former [2005/52]FI18.05.2005
SE18.08.2005
Former [2005/50]SE18.08.2005
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9903429  (JANSSON VOLKMAR [DE]) [X] 1-6,10,12,16,18 * figure - * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1 * [A] 9;
 [XA]EP1099426  (AMPLITUDE [FR]) [X] 1-4,16,18 * figures 1,2,6 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 5 * [A] 11,17;
 [XA]FR2716106  (APRICOT COTYLE IMPACTE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,13,16,18 * figures 1-5 * * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 3 * [A] 3,4,7-9,11;
 [XA]EP1068843  (BIOMET MERCK FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10,12,16,18 * figure - * * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 16 * [A] 3,8,9,11;
 [XA]EP1072236  (BIOMET MERCK FRANCE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,13,16,18 * figures 2-5 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 30 * [A] 6,7,9,11;
 [XA]EP0923915  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL [US]) [X] 1,2,8,16,17 * figures 3,3A,4 * * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 21 * [A] 11,14;
 [XA]US3840904  (TRONZO R) [X] 1-4,16 * figures 1,4,16,17 * * column 3, line 5 - line 12 * [A] 9-12,14,15,17
by applicantEP0601224
 EP0943304
 US4173797
 US5972032
 US5755799
 US6231612