Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1259964 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2006 | B1 | EP1259964 | 27.11.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10028422 | 06.06.2000 | DE0102069 | 01.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50110804D1 | 05.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10028422 | 06.06.2000 | DE0102069 | 01.06.2001 | DE50110804 | 01.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6844603 | 18.01.2005 | B2 | US2003109099 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10028422 | 06.06.2000 | DE0102069 | 01.06.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0195337 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10028422 | 06.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10028422 | 06.06.2002 | C2 | DE10028422 | 20.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10028422 | 06.06.2000 |