Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257170

EP1257170 - METHOD FOR ANONYMOUSLY REGISTERING, STORING AND USING BODY MATERIAL AND/OR INFORMATION DERIVED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intresco B.V.
Spechtenkamp 99
3607 KE Maarssen / NL
[2005/51]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Nietfeld, Jan Jaap
Spechtenkamp 99
3607 KE Maarssen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Nietfeld, Jan Jaap
Spechtenkamp 99
3607 KE Maarssen / NL
 [2005/51]
Former [2002/47]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2002/47]Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date01952044.426.02.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001NL00160
Priority number, dateNL2000101449125.02.2000         Original published format: NL 1014491
[2002/47]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0170023
Date:27.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257170
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257170
Date:18.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:A01N1/02, A61B5/117
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANONYMEN REGISTRIEREN, SPEICHERN UND VERWENDEN VON KÖRPERMATERIAL UND/ODER DAVON ABGELEITETER INFORMATION[2002/47]
English:METHOD FOR ANONYMOUSLY REGISTERING, STORING AND USING BODY MATERIAL AND/OR INFORMATION DERIVED THEREFROM[2002/47]
French:PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT, DE MEMORISATION ET D'UTILISATION ANONYME DE MATERIAU ANATOMIQUE ET/OU D'INFORMATION DERIVEE DE CE MATERIAU[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2001Translation filed 
23.08.2002National basic fee paid 
23.08.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.03.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
20.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2005Fee for grant paid
15.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.10.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200303   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.01.2006
TR18.01.2006
MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
GR19.04.2006
PT19.06.2006
[2009/03]
Former [2008/38]TR18.01.2006
MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
GR19.04.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2008/20]MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
GR19.04.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2007/45]MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2007/36]IT18.01.2006
MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2007/10]MC28.02.2006
LU18.03.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2006/48]MC28.02.2006
PT19.06.2006
Former [2006/44]MC28.02.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9743453  (BEECHAM JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-8 * claim - * * page 8, line 20 - line 26 *;
 [A]WO9515493  (ANONYMOUS TEST SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,8 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9109521  (CRYO CELL INT [US]) [A] 1,2 * claims 12,15,16 *