blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1305567

EP1305567 - MEASUREMENT OF CYLINDRICAL OBJECTS THROUGH LASER TELEMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITE CATHOLIQUE DE LOUVAIN
1, Place de l'Université
1348 Louvain la Neuve / BE
[2006/20]
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
UNIVERSITE CATHOLIQUE DE LOUVAIN
1, Place de l'Université
1348 Louvain la Neuve / BE
Inventor(s)01 / DEMEYERE, Michael, c/o Univ Catholique de Louvain
Place de l'Université 1
B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
02 / DEREINE, Emmanuel, c/o Univ Catholique de Louvain
Place de l'Université 1
B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
03 / EUGENE, Christian, c/o Univ Catholique de Louvain
Place de l'Université 1
B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
04 / NAYDENOV, Volodia
Ruelle Saint Eloi 4/101
B-1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)Bird, Ariane, et al
Bird Goën & Co
Wetenschapspark Arenberg
Gaston Geenslaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Bird, Ariane, et al
Bird Goen & Co, Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Application number, filing date01953059.127.06.2001
[2003/18]
WO2001BE00112
Priority number, dateEP2000087014427.06.2000         Original published format: EP 00870144
GB2001001226321.05.2001         Original published format: GB 0112263
[2003/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0201150
Date:03.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1305567
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1305567
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.01.2002
ClassificationIPC:G01B11/08, G01B11/24
[2003/18]
CPC:
G01B11/25 (EP,US); G01B11/08 (EP,US); G06T7/521 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERMESSUNG ZYLINDRISCHER OBJEKTE MIT HILFE VON LASER-TELEMETRIE[2003/18]
English:MEASUREMENT OF CYLINDRICAL OBJECTS THROUGH LASER TELEMETRY[2003/18]
French:MESURE D'OBJETS CYLINDRIQUES PAR TELEMETRIE LASER[2003/18]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2002National basic fee paid 
20.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/18]
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2006Fee for grant paid
22.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
CY17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
FR17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
TR17.05.2006
IE27.06.2006
LU27.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
GR18.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
DE03.01.2007
[2009/01]
Former [2008/37]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
TR17.05.2006
IE27.06.2006
LU27.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
GR18.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
DE03.01.2007
Former [2008/20]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
IE27.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
GR18.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
DE03.01.2007
Former [2007/36]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
IT17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
IE27.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
DE03.01.2007
Former [2007/25]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
IE27.06.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
Former [2007/19]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
NL17.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
Former [2007/13]AT17.05.2006
BE17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
Former [2007/12]AT17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
PT17.10.2006
Former [2007/07]AT17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
MC30.06.2006
DK17.08.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
Former [2007/03]AT17.05.2006
CH17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
LI17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
Former [2006/52]AT17.05.2006
FI17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
Former [2006/51]FI17.05.2006
SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
Former [2006/50]SE17.08.2006
ES28.08.2006
Former [2006/48]SE17.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[X]US5046852  (HAMETNER ALBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 5, line 3 - column 7, line 64 * * column 11, line 54 - column 11, line 65; figures 1-7,17 *;
 [A]US5090811  (DONALDSON CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *;
 [AD]US5129010  (HIGUCHI KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-25 * abstract ** column 14, line 22 - column 14, line 43; figures 1,16-18 *;
 [A]EP0871008  (MICROTEC SRL [IT]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.