Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1318783

EP1318783 - A DRINKING VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jackel International Limited
Dudley Lane Cramlington
Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
[2014/16]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
Jackel International Limited
Dudley Lane
Cramlington Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / WEBB, Ian, Alexander
12 Junction Mews
London W2 1PN / GB
02 / WEARMOUTH, Richard
Jackel International Limited
Dudley Lane
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
03 / HUDSON, Richard
Jackel International Limited
Dudley Lane
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
 [2014/16]
Former [2003/25]01 / WEBB, Ian, Alexander
12 Junction Mews
London W2 1PN / GB
02 / WEARMOUTH, Richard
Jackel International Limited, Dudley Lane
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
03 / HUDSON, Richard
Jackel International Limited, Dudley Lane
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 7RH / GB
Representative(s)Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/16]Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2003/25]Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan , et al
KILBURN & STRODE, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date01953207.625.07.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001GB03340
Priority number, dateGB2000002234512.09.2000         Original published format: GB 0022345
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222073
Date:21.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1318783
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1318783
Date:16.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61J11/00, B65D47/20, A47G19/22, F16K1/12
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
TitleGerman:TRINKGEFÄSS[2003/25]
English:A DRINKING VESSEL[2003/25]
French:RECIPIENT A BOIRE[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2003National basic fee paid 
14.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2014Fee for grant paid
19.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2005
Opposition(s)19.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
21.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
TR16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/21]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/37]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
IE25.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/20]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/13]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
LU25.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT16.04.2014
BE16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT16.04.2014
CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
Former [2014/50]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
GR17.07.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
Former [2014/47]CY16.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]US3141580  (ROGERS HOWARD L) [X] 1,2,5-7,11-14,16-25 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 22; figure - *;
 [XA]US2584359  (MILES LAWRENCE D) [X] 1-5,7-9,12-20,24 * column 3, line 3 - line 75; figure - * [A] 22,23,25;
 [X]US3244332  (ROGERS HOWARD L) [X] 1-5,7,11-25 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 54; figure - *;
 [X]DE275456  (ELZER) [X] 1,2,4-8,11,14,16-20,24 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE272349  (KÜHNLE) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,12-14,17-20,24 * the whole document *;
 [DX]WO0048491  (JACKEL INT PTY LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-5,7,8,16-20,24 * page 2, line 27 - page 7, line 18; figure - *;
 [A]US3656660  (MUELLER JOHN J) [A] 10-14,21-23,25 * column 3, line 9 - line 23; figures 1-3 *
by applicantGB2333770
 US5186347
 WO9947029