Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1257436

EP1257436 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR LOADING A TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.02.2008
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Middlegate Marketing Limited
Middlegate House, The Hill
Worlaby, Brigg DN20 0NP / GB
[2003/31]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Insulated Structures Ltd
P.O. Box 40, Normanby Road
Scunthorpe, North Lincolnshire DN15 8BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DIBDIN, Peter
P.O. Box 40, Normanby Road
Scunthorpe, North Lincolnshire DN15 8BQ / GB
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Croston, David , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]Croston, David , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2003/31]Allman, Peter John , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Former [2002/47]Brandon, Paul Laurence , et al
APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date01953629.125.01.2001
[2002/47]
WO2001GB00279
Priority number, dateGB2000000386621.02.2000         Original published format: GB 0003866
GB2000001234420.05.2000         Original published format: GB 0012344
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0162542
Date:30.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1257436
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2001
[2002/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1257436
Date:28.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/02
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN AN EINEM VERFAHREN UND EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUM BELADEN EINES ANHÄNGERS[2002/47]
English:IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR LOADING A TRAILER[2002/47]
French:AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES PROCEDES ET A UN APPAREIL DESTINES AU CHARGEMENT D'UNE REMORQUE[2002/47]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2002National basic fee paid 
04.09.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.09.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
27.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2007Fee for grant paid
09.02.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
11.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200404   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
31.01.200505   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.03.2007
BE28.03.2007
CH28.03.2007
CY28.03.2007
DK28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
LI28.03.2007
TR28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
GR29.06.2007
PT28.08.2007
[2010/37]
Former [2009/33]AT28.03.2007
BE28.03.2007
CH28.03.2007
CY28.03.2007
DK28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
LI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
GR29.06.2007
PT28.08.2007
Former [2008/20]AT28.03.2007
BE28.03.2007
CH28.03.2007
DK28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
LI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
GR29.06.2007
PT28.08.2007
Former [2008/08]AT28.03.2007
BE28.03.2007
CH28.03.2007
DK28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
LI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
PT28.08.2007
Former [2007/48]AT28.03.2007
BE28.03.2007
CH28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
LI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
PT28.08.2007
Former [2007/46]AT28.03.2007
FI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
Former [2007/38]FI28.03.2007
SE28.06.2007
Former [2007/36]FI28.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0624491  (AVELING BARFORD MACHINES PLC [GB]) [X] 1,19 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 24 * * column A; figure - * [A] 20-22;
 [X]FR2530558  (LAMBERET MARIUS [FR]) [X] 1,19 * page 2, line 15 - line 22; figures 6-8 *;
 [XA]FR1353904  (KAPPEN) [X] 1,19 * page 2, column L, line 5 - page 2, column R, line 40 * [A] 2;
 [A]EP0278558  (WHC NUNNIKHOVEN HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,5 * column A; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPS61155037  ;
 [A]EP0611245  (WILSON FREDERICK GEORGE [GB]) [A] 1,7,8,19,20,22 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 34 - line 56; figure - *;
 [A]US5915913  (GREENLAW ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-4,11,14,15 * column 5, line 26 - line 39 * * column 6, line 50 - line 65 * * column 7, line 42 - line 50; figure - *;
 [A]GB903229  (MICHAEL MCKENNA LTD, et al) [A] 2 * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO8800538  (HYDRAROLL LTD [GB])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861202), vol. 010, no. 357, Database accession no. (M - 540), [A] 7-9 * abstract *