blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1315464

EP1315464 - APPARATUS FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/23]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF TISSUE
[2005/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TherMatrx, Inc.
2211-B Lakeside Drive
Bannockburn, Illinois 60015 / US
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAEFERMEYER, Theron, N.
851 East Eaglewood
North Salt Lake City, UT 84054 / US
02 / PERLMUTTER, Aaron
Apartment 5A, 525 East 89th Street
New York, NY 10128 / US
03 / MANKER, Charles
35 N. Green Bay Road
Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Schmitt, Armand, et al
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A.
234, route d'Arlon
B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Schmitt, Armand, et al
Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48
8001 Strassen / LU
Application number, filing date01954920.324.07.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001US23266
Priority number, dateUS2000063252304.08.2000         Original published format: US 632523
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0211636
Date:14.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315464
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315464
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61B18/14
[2003/23]
CPC:
A61B18/1485 (EP,US); A61B18/1492 (EP,US); A61B2018/00214 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00285 (EP,US); A61B2018/00505 (EP,US); A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US); A61B2018/00702 (EP,US); A61B2018/00761 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US); A61B2018/183 (EP,US); A61B2018/1846 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHRTUNG ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE[2005/11]
English:APPARATUS FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF TISSUE[2005/11]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE TISSUS[2005/11]
Former [2003/23]VORRICHRTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG VON GEWEBE
Former [2003/23]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HEAT TREATMENT OF TISSUE
Former [2003/23]DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE TISSUS ET TECHNIQUE CORRESPONDANTE
Entry into regional phase25.02.2003National basic fee paid 
25.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
14.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2005Fee for grant paid
12.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
TR14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
[2009/42]
Former [2009/02]CY14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/25]FI14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/15]FI14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI14.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5249585  (TURNER PAUL F [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5531676  (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [Y] 1* column 9, lines 1-6 *
by applicantUS4967765
 US5220927
 US5234435
 US5249585
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.