blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1307974

EP1307974 - METHOD AND BASE STATION FOR DATA TRANSMISSION FROM AND TO USER STATIONS USING A COMMON TIMESLOT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.08.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2008  [2008/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/50]For all designated states
NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
Former [2007/38]For all designated states
NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG
St. Martin Strasse 76
81541 München / DE
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHUHMACHER, Friedrich
Hansastr. 138
81373 München / DE
02 / REHFUESS, Ulrich
Geisenbrunner Str. 56
81475 München / DE
03 / BALL, Carsten
Treffauer Str. 48
81373 München / DE
 [2003/19]
Application number, filing date01955263.720.07.2001
[2003/19]
WO2001DE02738
Priority number, dateDE200013866708.08.2000         Original published format: DE 10038667
[2003/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0213416
Date:14.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1307974
Date:07.05.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1307974
Date:26.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/005
[2003/19]
CPC:
H04W52/32 (EP,US); H04B7/0408 (EP,US); H04L2001/0098 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2003/19]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND BASISSTATION FÜR DIE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG VON UND ZU EINEN ZEITSCHLITZ GEMEINSAM NUTZENDEN TEILNEHMERSTATIONEN[2003/19]
English:METHOD AND BASE STATION FOR DATA TRANSMISSION FROM AND TO USER STATIONS USING A COMMON TIMESLOT[2003/19]
French:PROCEDE ET STATION DE BASE PERMETTANT LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES DE ET VERS DES STATIONS D'ABONNE UTILISANT UN CRENEAU DE TEMPS COMMUN[2003/19]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2003National basic fee paid 
04.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/19]
08.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2007Fee for grant paid
06.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US6072792  (MAZUR SARA [SE], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * column 4, line 7 - line 17 * * column 4, line 41 - line 64 * * column 5, line 44 - column 8, line 44 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.