Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320900

EP1320900 - Improved GaN light-emitting diode [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/26]IMPROVED GaN LIGHT EMITTING DIODE
[2015/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2016
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dalian Luming Science and Technology Group Company, Ltd.
10 Hoad, Qixianling Industrial Base High-Tech Industrial Zone
Dalian 116023 / CN
[2015/30]
Former [2005/02]For all designated states
Dalian Luming Science and Technology Group Company, Ltd.
10 Hoad, Qixianling Industrial Base, High-Tech Industrial Zone
Dalian 116023 / CN
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
American Xtal Technology, Inc.
4281 Technology Drive
Fremont, CA 94568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, John
19347 Andrada Drive
Rowland Heights, CA 91748 / US
02 / LIANG, Bingwen
995-3 Asilomar Terrace
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
03 / SHIH, Robert
12650 Belmont Place
Cerritos, CA 90703 / US
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/30]Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Former [2008/46]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
Former [2004/48]Meissner, Bolte & Partner
Anwaltssozietät GbR Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2003/26]Feray, Valérie , et al
Feray Lenne Conseil 44/52, Rue de la Justice
75020 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date01955967.325.07.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US23452
Priority number, dateUS2000062644326.07.2000         Original published format: US 626443
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0209475
Date:31.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320900
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1320900
Date:22.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US27.06.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.01.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01L33/14, H01L33/30, H01L33/38
[2015/09]
Former International [2003/26]H01L33/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbesserte GaN-Leuchtdiode[2015/10]
English:Improved GaN light-emitting diode[2015/10]
French:Diode GaN d'émission lumineuse améliorée[2015/10]
Former [2003/26]VERBESSERTE GaN-LEUCHTDIODE
Former [2003/26]IMPROVED GaN LIGHT EMITTING DIODE
Former [2003/26]DIODE GAN D'EMISSION LUMINEUSE AMELIOREE
Entry into regional phase26.02.2003National basic fee paid 
26.02.2003Search fee paid 
26.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
26.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
02.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2015Fee for grant paid
11.06.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.01.2009
Opposition(s)25.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
07.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
IE25.07.2015
LU25.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/40]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
CY22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
NL22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
TR22.07.2015
IE25.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2017/03]AT22.07.2015
BE22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
IE25.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/33]AT22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
IE25.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
MC22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
CH31.07.2015
LI31.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT22.07.2015
DK22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT22.07.2015
FI22.07.2015
SE22.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
PT23.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI22.07.2015
GR23.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19820777  (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 11-13; example 1 * * figures 19,20; example 4 *;
 [X]US5977566  (OKAZAKI HARUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 57; figure 1(a) *
International search[XP]US6133589
 [YX]US6268618
 [YP]US6248607
 [AP]US6236066
 [A]US6091197
 [A]US5696389
 [A]US5309001
 [A]US4864370
 [A]US4214251
 [A]US4145707
 [A]JPH0478174
 [A]US5698865
 [A]  DURBHA ET AL., "Thermal stability of ohmic contacts to n-InxGal-xN", MAT. RES. SOC. SYMP. PROC., (1996), vol. 395, PAGE 825 - 830, XP002906565 [A]
by applicant DE19820777
  US5977566