EP1320292 - METHOD OF CLONING PORCINE ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infigen, Inc. 1825 Infinity Drive Deforest, Wisconsin 53532 / US | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMIANI, Philip 6 1/2 Water Street Spencer, MA 01562 / US | 02 /
BETTHAUSER, Jeffrey, M. 6756 Dawn Drive Windsor, WI 53598 / US | 03 /
FORSBERG, Erik, J. 5707 Niagara Court Oregon, WI 53575 / US | 04 /
BISHOP, Michael, D. W4628 Hall Road Rio, WI 53598 / US | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Wright, Simon Mark J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2003/26] | Wright, Simon Mark J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London, WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01956022.6 | 27.07.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001US23781 | Priority number, date | US20000221434P | 28.07.2000 Original published format: US 221434 P | US20000753323 | 28.12.2000 Original published format: US 753323 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0210337 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320292 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
C12N15/873 (EP,US);
A01K67/0273 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
C12N15/8778 (EP,US);
C12N5/0603 (EP,US);
C12N5/0611 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/108 (EP,US);
A01K2267/02 (EP,US);
A01K2267/025 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,US);
C12N2500/34 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/125 (EP,US);
C12N2501/235 (EP,US);
C12N2502/13 (EP,US);
C12N2517/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHWEINKLONIERUNG | [2003/26] | English: | METHOD OF CLONING PORCINE ANIMALS | [2003/26] | French: | METHODE DE CLONAGE DE PORCS | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/38] | 19.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 16.04.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2007 | Decision despatched | 29.03.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2003 | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2007 | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO0031237 (INFIGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-15,17-20 * examples 2-10 * * claims 1-42 * [A] 3,5,16,33,35 [Y] 21-32,34,36-49; | [X]ZA989825 ; | [A]WO9839416 (INFIGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 14,30 * page 72, line 15 - line 19 *; | [Y]WO9909141 (BIOTRANSPLANT INC [US]) [Y] 21-32,34,36-46 * page 33, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO9528412 (BIOTRANSPLANT INC [US], et al) [Y] 47-49 * example 6; claim 10 * | [X] - "Generation of transgenic animal embryos -- used for producing transgenic animals in which endogenous gene is deleted or modified or new gene is expressed.", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 99, no. 47, Database accession no. 1999-562312, XP002216061 & ZA9809825 A 19990728 (BIOTRANSPLANT INC.) [X] 47-49 * abstract * | Examination | - BLUM-RECKOW B.; HOLTZ W., "Transfer of porcine embryos after 3 days of in vitro culture", J. ANIM. SCI., (1991), vol. 69, pages 3335 - 3342 |