Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235823

EP1235823 - H-ANNELLATED BENZO [F]CHROMENES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/36]H-ANNELLATED BENZO F]CHROMENES
[2002/48]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.05.2004
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.07.2004  [2004/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstrasse 43
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/35]For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
IsartalStrasse 43
80469 München / DE
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Optische Werke G. Rodenstock
Isartalstrasse 43
80469 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MANN, Claudia
Volkartstrasse 21
80634 München / DE
02 / MELZIG, Manfred
Sommerstrasse 20
82234 Wessling / DE
03 / WEIGAND, Udo
Menzingerstrasse 21
80638 München / DE
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date01956558.924.07.2001
[2002/36]
WO2001EP08557
Priority number, dateDE200014584814.09.2000         Original published format: DE 10045848
[2002/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0222594
Date:21.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235823
Date:04.09.2002
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002
[2002/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1235823
Date:16.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07D311/78, C07D493/06, C07D498/06, C07D311/94
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/29]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:H-ANNELLIERTE BENZO [F]CHROMENE[2002/48]
English:H-ANNELLATED BENZO [F]CHROMENES[2002/48]
French:BENZO [F]CHROMENES H ANNELES[2002/48]
Former [2002/36]H-ANNELLIERTE BENZO F]CHROMENE
Former [2002/36]H-ANNELLATED BENZO F]CHROMENES
Former [2002/36]BENZO F]CHROMENES H ANNELES
Entry into regional phase18.04.2002National basic fee paid 
18.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
07.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2003Fee for grant paid
16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/28]
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5869658  (LIN JIBING ET AL) [DA] 1-12 * Spalten 20, 21: Tabelle 1;; examples 1-10; claim - *;
 [A]WO9923071  (BOURCHTEINE KONSTANTINE ;BREYNE OLIVIER (FR); CORNING INC (US)) [A] 1-12 * Seite 27, Tabelle;; claims 1-13 *