blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1235823 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1235823



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
25.05.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
14.07.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
25.06.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
24.06.2003 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.06.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.04.2003 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2003 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.01.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
10.01.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 8
17.12.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
07.11.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.11.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
07.11.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
24.07.2002 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.07.2002 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
12.07.2002 Preparation for B publication Search / examination 2
17.04.2002 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.04.2002 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.04.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 4
21.03.2002 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.03.2002 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 23
05.09.2001 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
05.09.2001 Claims International Searching Authority 7
05.09.2001 Description International Searching Authority 13
05.09.2001 Drawings International Searching Authority 2