blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1235823


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.05.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
11.07.2003 Change - applicant published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
30.05.2003 (Expected) grant published on  16.07.2003  [2003/29]
29.01.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.10.2002 Change - German title published on  27.11.2002  [2002/48]
19.07.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
19.07.2002 Request for examination filed published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
13.07.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
23.04.2002 Change - extension states
12.04.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.2002 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2001 PCT data prior to European publication