blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1235823
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2004509109Global Dossier 25.03.2004A
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1235823Global Dossier 16.07.2003B1
EP1235823 04.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU778377B 02.12.2004B2
AU7850501 26.03.2002A
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2390770 01.09.2009C
CA2390770 21.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50100383D 21.08.2003D1
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
DE50100383 24.07.2001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6686468 03.02.2004B2
US2003040623 27.02.2003A1
Priority number Date
EP0108557 24.07.2001
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0222594Global Dossier 21.03.2002A1
Priority number Date
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2201041T 16.03.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE10045848 14.09.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ZA200203275 24.07.2003B
Priority number Date
DE10045848 14.09.2000