blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1235823

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure16.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase18.04.2002National basic fee paid 
18.04.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2002Examination fee paid 
European patent granted16.07.2003
Opposition procedure19.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.07.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20020418
 
Event date:27.11.2002 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:H-ANNELLATED BENZO (F)CHROMENES
 
Event date:16.07.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT
 
Event date:16.07.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:16.07.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:20.08.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:21.08.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:50100383
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030821
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:27.08.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:RODENSTOCK GMBH
 
Event date:19.11.2003 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20031025
 
Event date:06.02.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:25.02.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:05.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:16.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2201041 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:07.07.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040419
 
Event date:28.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:23.02.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:08.02.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:12.05.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:12.05.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
 
Event date:28.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
Effective DATE:20110929
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20110729
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:09.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20111013 AND 20111019
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20110720
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20110721
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.12.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20110729
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20110525
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:27.03.2013 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20120724
 
Event date:26.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20130329
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130201
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120724
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120731
 
Event date:16.05.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 50100383 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130201
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120724
 
Event date:22.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20131022
 
Event date:30.05.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20120725