Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1343580

EP1343580 - IMPROVED SYSTEM FOR FLUIDIZED CATALYTIC CRACKING OF HYDROCARBON MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.09.2010  [2010/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company
1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900
Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SENIOR, Richard, Charles
25 Leonie Hill, 19-01 Leonie Gardens
Singapore 239225 / SG
 [2003/46]
Former [2003/38]01 / SENIOR, Richard, Charles
2639 Wild Timothy Road
Naperville, IL 60564 / US
Representative(s)Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2003/38]Troch, Geneviève
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105
1830 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date01957140.513.07.2001
[2003/38]
WO2001US22024
Priority number, dateUS2000061644814.07.2000         Original published format: US 616448
[2003/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0205941
Date:24.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1343580
Date:17.09.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1343580
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search reportUS24.01.2002
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:B01J8/18, C10G11/18, B01F5/06, B01J8/00
[2006/05]
Former International [2003/38]B01J8/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/38]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES SYSTEM ZUM FLIESSBETTCRACKING VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFMOLEKÜLEN[2003/38]
English:IMPROVED SYSTEM FOR FLUIDIZED CATALYTIC CRACKING OF HYDROCARBON MOLECULES[2003/38]
French:SYSTEME AMELIORE DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDISE DE MOLECULES D'HYDROCARBURES[2003/38]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2003National basic fee paid 
14.02.2003Search fee paid 
14.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/38]
11.09.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
10.11.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
02.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2007Fee for grant paid
21.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
TR10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
[2010/37]
Former [2009/33]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/15]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/13]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
SE10.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0960929  (TOTAL RAFFINAGE DISTRIBUTION [FR]) [X] 1-10,14,15 * paragraphs [0062] , [0064] , [0068]; figures 1,2 * [A] 11-13,16,17;
 [A]EP0458416  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]US4808383  (BUYAN FRANK M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0000433  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *
International search[X]US4883583  (MAULEON JEAN-LOUIS [FR], et al);
 [X]US5139748  (LOMAS DAVID A [US], et al);
 [X]US5851380  (WELLS JAN W [US])