Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1300029

EP1300029 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VARIABLE POWER CONTROL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Extreme Networks, Inc.
6480 Via Del Oro
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
[2018/11]
Former [2017/13]For all designated states
Extreme Networks, Inc.
145 Rio Robles
San Jose, CA 95134 / US
Former [2016/15]For all designated states
Symbol Technologies, LLC
One Zebra Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742 / US
Former [2003/15]For all designated states
SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, New York 11742-1300 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHARONY, Jacob
c/o SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza
Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US
 [2003/15]
Representative(s)Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/07]Treleven, Colin , et al
Optimus Patents Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close
Chineham Court
Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2003/15]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing.
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01957141.312.07.2001
[2003/15]
WO2001US22041
Priority number, dateUS20000217588P12.07.2000         Original published format: US 217588 P
US20000245834P03.11.2000         Original published format: US 245834 P
US2001082358930.03.2001         Original published format: US 823589
[2003/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0205578
Date:17.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1300029
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2002
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.01.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/20
[2003/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VARIABLEN LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2003/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR VARIABLE POWER CONTROL IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS[2003/15]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE VARIABLE DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2003/15]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2002National basic fee paid 
22.02.2002Search fee paid 
22.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2002Examination requested  [2003/15]
27.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
14.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.09.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/01]
24.09.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.11.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/01]
Appeal following examination24.11.2015Appeal received No.  T0504/16
26.01.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.11.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
07.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 13
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 14
24.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 15
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 16
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 17
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 18
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 19
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9912275  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 3 - page 6; figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0795969  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 4; claims 1,2 *;
 [X]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, "3G TS25.214(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL LAYER PROCEDURES (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 10 - 23, XP002541054 [X] 1-10 * page 19 *
 [A]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, "3G TS25.211(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL CHANNELS AND MAPPING OF TRANSPORT CHANNELS ONTO PHYSICAL CHANNELS (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 42, XP002541055 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, "3G TS25.212(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; MULTIPLEXING AND CHANNEL CODING (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 62, XP002541056 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, "3G TS25.215(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL LAYER - MEASUREMENTS (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 17, XP002541057 [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
International search[X]US5722051  (AGRAWAL PRATHIMA [US], et al);
 [A]US6084888  (WATANABE KOUJI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5889604  (HAYASHI KEIICHI [JP]);
 [A]US5293639  (WILSON ALAN L [US], et al);
 [A]US5345504  (WEST JR LAMAR E [US]);
 [A]US5396516  (PADOVANI ROBERTO [US], et al)
by applicantWO9912275
 EP0795969
    - "3G TS25.214(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL LAYER PROCEDURES (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 10 - 23
    - "3G TS25.211 (V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL CHANNELS AND MAPPING OF TRANSPORT CHANNELS ONTO PHYSICAL CHANNELS (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 42
    - "3G TS25.212(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; MULTIPLEXING AND CHANNEL CODING (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 62
    - "3G TS25.215(V3.3.0); TSG RADIO ACCESS NETWORK; PHYSICAL LAYER - MEASUREMENTS (FDD) (RELEASE 1999)", 3 GPP, (20000630), pages 1 - 17