blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1309287

EP1309287 - DENTAL SPLINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip25.12.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 27.01.2010  [2010/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medartis AG
Austrasse 24
4051 Basel / CH
[2003/20]
Inventor(s)01 / VON ARX, Thomas
Chriesiweg 20
CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH
02 / FILIPPI, Andreas
Reichensteinerstrasse 5
CH-4053 Basel / CH
03 / PFEFFERLE, Joachim
Krumlinden 20
79244 Münstertal / DE
 [2003/20]
Representative(s)Heinen, Detlef, et al
Bohest AG
Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Heinen, Detlef, et al
BOHEST AG Postfach 160
4003 Basel / CH
Former [2003/20]Heinen, Detlef, et al
c/o A.Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG, Holbeinstrasse 36-38
4051 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date01957677.616.08.2001
[2003/20]
WO2001CH00502
Priority number, dateCH2000000158616.08.2000         Original published format: CH 158600
[2003/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0213716
Date:21.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1309287
Date:14.05.2003
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2003/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1309287
Date:10.01.2007
Language:DE
[2007/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.02.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61C5/00, A61C7/00
[2003/20]
CPC:
A61C5/007 (EP,US); A61C7/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/20]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHNSCHIENE[2003/20]
English:DENTAL SPLINT[2003/20]
French:APPAREIL DENTAIRE FIXE D'ORTHODONTIE[2003/20]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2003National basic fee paid 
01.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/20]
24.03.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.07.2006Fee for grant paid
26.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY10.01.2007
DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
FR10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
TR10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
AT16.08.2007
LU16.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
[2010/04]
Former [2009/37]CY10.01.2007
DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
FR10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
AT16.08.2007
LU16.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/33]CY10.01.2007
DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
FR10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
AT16.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/52]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
FR10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
AT16.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/50]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
AT16.08.2007
BE31.08.2007
FR31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/40]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
BE31.08.2007
FR31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/23]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
IT10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
FR31.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/20]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
GR11.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/51]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
GB10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/48]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
IE10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/46]DK10.01.2007
FI10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/39]FI10.01.2007
NL10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
ES21.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/38]FI10.01.2007
SE10.04.2007
PT11.06.2007
Former [2007/36]FI10.01.2007
PT11.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4433960  (GARITO JON C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,11 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 54; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,9;
 [XY]US5087202  (KRENKEL CHRISTIAN [AT]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,11 * column 1, lines 5-11 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 36 * * column 3, lines 4-23 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,12;
 [A]US5184955  (BAER HANS [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,5,7,8,11 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 40 * * column 4, lines 30-50 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US5829979  (KOBASHIGAWA ALVIN I [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, lines 9-19 * * column 2, lines 24-56 * * column 5, lines 46-51 ** figures 4-11 *;
 [Y]US6095809  (KELLY JOHN S [US], et al) [Y] 6,12 * column 5, lines 46-53 * * column 6, lines 6-34 * * figures 1-6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.