EP1315865 - METHOD FOR ADDING PIGMENT TO PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM-Kymmene Corporation Eteläesplanadi 2 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELIN, Jukka Lammentie 12B FIN-42300 Jämsänkoski / FI | 02 /
HANGASLAMMI, Arto Hartusvuorentie 13 FIN-42100 Jämsä / FI | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01958129.7 | 10.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001FI00706 | Priority number, date | FI20000001806 | 15.08.2000 Original published format: FI 20001806 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0214603 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315865 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/22, D21H19/36 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
D21H17/70 (EP);
D21H19/36 (EP);
D21H23/22 (EP);
D21H17/675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ADDITION EINES PIGMENTS AN PAPIER | [2003/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ADDING PIGMENT TO PAPER | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE D'ADDITION DE PIGMENT A DU PAPIER | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FI96336B ; | [Y]EP0853159 ; | [XP]WO0155506 ; | [A]US5262006 |