Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320528

EP1320528 - SUBSTITUTED PHTHALIDES AS ANTI-CONVULSIVE DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIA MEDICA OF CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES
1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xuan Wu Dist.
Beijing 100050 / CN
For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
1, rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
THE INSTITUTE OF MATERIA MEDICA OF CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES
1 Xian Nong Tan Street
Xuan Wu Dist., Beijing 100050 / CN
For all designated states
Les Laboratoires Servier
1, rue Carle Hébert
92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GUO, Zongru
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
02 / CHU, Fengming
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Juntian
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
04 / YANG, Guangzhong
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
05 / XU, Bailing
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
06 / NIU, Xinyi
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
07 / REN, Zhihong
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
08 / LESTAGE, Pierre
1, Xian Nong Tan Street
Beijing 100050 / CN
09 / RENARD, Pierre
3 avenue du Parc
78150 Le Chesnay / FR
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date01958282.427.06.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001IB01535
Priority number, dateCN200011932928.06.2000         Original published format: CN 00119329
[2003/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0200638
Date:03.01.2002
Language:FR
[2002/01]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1320528
Date:25.06.2003
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07D307/88, A61K31/34, A61P25/00
[2003/47]
Former International [2003/26]C07D307/88, A61K31/34, A61P15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesAL03.12.2002
LT03.12.2002
LV03.12.2002
MK03.12.2002
RO03.12.2002
SI03.12.2002
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE PHTALIDE ALS ANTIKONVULSIVE WIRKENDE MEDIKAMENTE[2003/26]
English:SUBSTITUTED PHTHALIDES AS ANTI-CONVULSIVE DRUGS[2003/26]
French:SUBSTITUIERTE PHTHALIDE ALS ANTIKONVULSIVE MEDIKAMENTE[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2002National basic fee paid 
03.12.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/26]
30.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
15.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4855320  (CHATTERJEE SHYAM SUNDER DIPL C [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0151964  (LAB FARMACEUTICO C T SRL [IT]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0341081  (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *