Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1294295

EP1294295 - POLYAXIAL CONNECTION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.03.2013  [2013/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ritland, Stephen
P.O. Box 2310
Flagstaff, AZ 86003-2310 / US
[2003/13]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/13]
Representative(s)Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli S.r.l.
Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2003/13]Petruzziello, Aldo , et al
Racheli & C. s.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4
20144 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date01958866.402.07.2001
[2003/13]
WO2001US21205
Priority number, dateUS20000215602P30.06.2000         Original published format: US 215602 P
[2003/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0202022
Date:10.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/02]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1294295
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2002
[2003/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.01.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/34, A61B17/02, // A61B17/00
[2009/52]
Former International [2003/13]A61B17/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/13]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:POLYAXIALES VERBINDUNGSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN[2003/13]
English:POLYAXIAL CONNECTION DEVICE AND METHOD[2003/13]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CONNEXION POLYAXIALE[2003/13]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2003National basic fee paid 
16.01.2003Search fee paid 
16.01.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
16.01.2003Examination requested  [2003/13]
10.03.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/13]
07.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2013/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
01.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
19.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201212   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9629947  (SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS INC [US]) [A] 1-36 * page 8, line 11 - page 12, line 16; figures 3-5 *
International search[X]US5466238  ;
 [XP]US6117137  ;
 [X]US6050997  ;
 [X]US6074393  ;
 [XE]US6261287  ;
 [XP]US6264658