Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1319064

EP1319064 - GSK3 POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 11.08.2010  [2010/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
CHIRON CORPORATION
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, California 94608 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HARRISON, Stephen, D.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
02 / HALL, John, A.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
03 / CALDERON-CACIA, Maria
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
04 / ZHONG, Ziyang
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
05 / FANG, Eric, Y.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
06 / COIT, Doris, G.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
07 / NGUYEN, Steven, H.
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
08 / MEDINA-SELBY, Angelica
4560 Horton Street
Emeryville, CA 94608 / US
 [2003/25]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date01959230.225.07.2001
[2003/25]
WO2001US23539
Priority number, dateUS20000221242P27.07.2000         Original published format: US 221242 P
[2003/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0210357
Date:07.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1319064
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1319064
Date:21.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/12
[2003/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:GSK3-POLYPEPTIDE[2003/25]
English:GSK3 POLYPEPTIDES[2003/25]
French:POLYPEPTIDES GSK3[2003/25]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2003National basic fee paid 
04.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/25]
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.10.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2007Fee for grant paid
16.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP07022387.0  / EP1914305
Opposition(s)22.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44]
Request for further processing for:29.06.2005Request for further processing filed
29.06.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.07.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
SE21.02.2008
LU25.07.2008
MC31.07.2008
[2010/32]
Former [2009/33]CY21.11.2007
DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
SE21.02.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2009/18]DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
SE21.02.2008
MC31.07.2008
Former [2008/35]DK21.11.2007
FI21.11.2007
SE21.02.2008
Former [2008/25]FI21.11.2007
SE21.02.2008
Former [2008/23]SE21.02.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]  - STRAUSBERG, "KG3B_HUMAN (human GSK beta sequence)", DATABASE EMBL, (19961001), Database accession no. P49841, URL: HTTP://SRS6.EBI.AC.UK/SRS6BIN/CGI-BIN/WGETZ?-E+[SW, XP002209722 [X] 1-26 * abstract *
 [X]  - DOMINGUEZ ET AL, "GSK-beta Xenopus", DATABASE EMBL, (19961101), Database accession no. Q91627, XP002209723 [X] 1-26 * abstract *
 [X]  - HE, "KG3A_HUMAN (human GSK alpha)", DATABASE EMBL, (19961001), Database accession no. P49840, XP002209724 [X] 1-26 * abstract *
 [Y]  - RANTY B ET AL, "Truncation of ribulose-1,5-bisphosphate carboxylase/oxygenase (Rubisco) from Rhodospirillum rubrum affects the holoenzyme assembly and activity.", THE EMBO JOURNAL. ENGLAND MAY 1990, (199005), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1365 - 1373, XP001096047 [Y] 1-26 * page 1365 - page 1375 *
 [Y]  - VAN DER LINDEN M P ET AL, "Domain organization of penicillin-binding protein 5 from Escherichia coli analysed by C-terminal truncation.", THE BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL. ENGLAND 15 JAN 1993, (19930115), vol. 289 ( Pt 2), ISSN 0264-6021, pages 593 - 598, XP002209721 [Y] 1-26 * the whole document *