EP1305453 - RING-SHAPED HIGH-DENSITY PLASMA SOURCE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [2009/19] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRCKA, Jozef 914 W. Laurel Avenue Gilbert, AZ 85233 / US | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Liesegang, Eva, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2003/18] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959288.0 | 27.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001US23752 | Priority number, date | US20000629515 | 01.08.2000 Original published format: US 629515 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210475 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305453 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1305453 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H01J37/34 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H01J37/3222 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (KR);
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01J37/3266 (EP,US);
H01J37/3408 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/18] | C23C16/505, C23C16/507 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/22] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGE HOCHDICHTE PLASMAQUELLE UND VERFAHREN | [2003/18] | English: | RING-SHAPED HIGH-DENSITY PLASMA SOURCE AND METHOD | [2003/18] | French: | SOURCE DE PLASMA ANNULAIRE A DENSITE ELEVEE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2008 | 13.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 06.05.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | GB | 06.08.2009 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/22] | NL | 06.05.2009 | |
FR | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | NL | 06.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5648701 (HOOKE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,21,37 * column 4, line 66 - column 9, line 38 ** figures 4,10,12 *; | [DX]WO9957746 (TOKYO ELECTRON ARIZONA INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,10,15,16,20,21,23,24,37,38 * abstract * * page 9, line 9 - page 11, line 25 * * figures 3,4 * | International search | [X]US6080287 (DREWERY JOHN S [US], et al) |