Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1320600
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
26.11.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.08.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.02.2004 |
First examination report |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.10.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
04.10.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2003 |
Change - inventor |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
09.05.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
09.05.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
28.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|