Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1320600

EP1320600 - TRANSPORTERS AND ION CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Incyte Genomics, Inc.
3160 Porter Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2003/26]
Inventor(s)01 / YUE, Henry
826 Lois Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / THORNTON, Michael
9 Medway Road
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
03 / RAMKUMAR, Jayalaxmi
34359 Maybird Circle
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
04 / TANG, Y. Tom
4230 Ranwick Court
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
05 / AZIMZAI, Yalda
5518 Boulder Canyon Drive
Castro Valley, CA 94522 / US
06 / BAUGHN, Mariah R.
14244 Santiaqo Road
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
07 / YANG, Junming
7125 Bank Lane
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
08 / YAO, Monique G.
111 Fredeick Court
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
09 / LAL, Preeti
P.O. Box 5142
Santa Clara, CA 95056 / US
10 / CHAWLA, Narinder K.
33 Union Square,712
Union City, CA 94587 / US
11 / GANDHI, Ameena R.
837 Roble Avenue No.1
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
12 / HAFALIA, April J.A.
2227 Calle de Primavera
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
13 / NGUYEN, Danniel B.
1403 Ridgewood Drive
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
14 / PATTERSON, Chandrea
490 Sherwood Way No.1
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
15 / ELLIOTT, Vicki S.
3770 Polten Place Way
San Jose, CA 95121 / US
16 / TRIBOULEY, Catherine M.
1121 Tennessee, No.5
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
17 / LU, DYUNG, Aina M.
233 Coy Drive
San Jose, CA 95123 / US
18 / XU, Yuming
1739 Walnut Drive
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
19 / REDDY, Roopa
1233 W. McKinely Avenue No.3
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
20 / HERNANDEZ, Roberto
160 Pine Tree Avenue
Canterbury, Kent CT2 7SZ / GB
21 / BOROWSKY, Mark L.
122 Orchard Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
22 / LO, Terence P.
1451 Beach Park Boulevard, Apt 115
Foster City, Ca 94404 / US
23 / LU, Yan
Corrina Way
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
24 / POLICKY, Jennifer L.
1511 Jarvis Court
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
25 / GREENE, Barrie D.
1332 10th Avenue No.104
San Franciso, CA 94122 / US
26 / SANJANWALA, Madhu S.
210 Sylvia Court
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
27 / RAUMANN, Brigitte E.
5801 South Dorchester Avenue No.3B
Chicago, IL 60637 / US
28 / BURFORD, Neil
105 Wildwood Circle
Durham, CT 06422 / US
29 / ISON, Craig H.
1242 Weathersfiedl Way
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
30 / LEE, Ernestine A.
624 Kains Street
Albany, CA 94706 / US
31 / DING, Li
3353 Alma Street No.146
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
32 / DAS, Debopriya
1179 Bonita Avenu Apt. 3
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
33 / KALLICK, Deborah A.
900 Olive Street
Menlo Park, Ca 94025 / US
34 / KHAN, Farrah A.
3617 Central Road No.102
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
35 / SEILHAMER, Jeffrey J.
12555 La Cresta
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
 [2003/35]
Former [2003/26]01 / YUE, Henry
826 Lois Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
02 / THORNTON, Michael
9 Medway Road
Woodside, CA 94062 / US
03 / RAMKUMAR, Jayalaxmi
34359 Maybird Circle
Fremont, CA 94555 / US
04 / TANG, Y. Tom
4230 Ranwick Court
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
05 / AZIMZAI, Yalda
5518 Boulder Canyon Drive
Castro Valley, CA 94522 / US
06 / BAUGHN, Mariah R.
14244 Santiaqo Road
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
07 / YANG, Junming
7125 Bank Lane
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
08 / YAO, Monique G.
111 Fredeick Court
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
09 / LAL, Preeti
P.O. Box 5142
Santa Clara, CA 95056 / US
10 / WALIA, Narinder K.
890 Roble Avenue No.1
San Leandro, CA 94577 / US
11 / GANDHI, Ameena R.
837 Roble Avenue No.1
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
12 / HAFALIA, April J.A.
2227 Calle de Primavera
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
13 / NGUYEN, Danniel B.
1403 Ridgewood Drive
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
14 / PATTERSON, Chandrea
490 Sherwood Way No.1
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
15 / ELLIOTT, Vicki S.
3770 Polten Place Way
San Jose, CA 95121 / US
16 / TRIBOULEY, Catherine M.
1121 Tennessee, No.5
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
17 / LU, DYUNG, Aina M.
233 Coy Drive
San Jose, CA 95123 / US
18 / XU, Yuming
1739 Walnut Drive
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
19 / REDDY, Roopa
1233 W. McKinely Avenue No.3
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
20 / HERNANDEZ, Roberto
160 Pine Tree Avenue
Canterbury, Kent CT2 7SZ / GB
21 / BOROWSKY, Mark L.
122 Orchard Avenue
Redwood City, CA 94061 / US
22 / LO, Terence P.
1451 Beach Park Boulevard, Apt 115
Foster City, Ca 94404 / US
23 / LU, Yan
Corrina Way
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
24 / POLICKY, Jennifer L.
1511 Jarvis Court
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
25 / GREENE, Barrie D.
1332 10th Avenue No.104
San Franciso, CA 94122 / US
26 / SANJANWALA, Madhu S.
210 Sylvia Court
Los Altos, CA 94024 / US
27 / RAUMANN, Brigitte E.
5801 South Dorchester Avenue No.3B
Chicago, IL 60637 / US
28 / BURFORD, Neil
105 Wildwood Circle
Durham, CT 06422 / US
29 / ISON, Craig H.
1242 Weathersfiedl Way
San Jose, CA 95118 / US
30 / LEE, Ernestine A.
624 Kains Street
Albany, CA 94706 / US
31 / DING, Li
3353 Alma Street No.146
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
32 / DAS, Debopriya
1179 Bonita Avenu Apt. 3
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
33 / KALLICK, Deborah A.
900 Olive Street
Menlo Park, Ca 94025 / US
34 / KHAN, Farrah A.
3617 Central Road No.102
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
35 / SEILHAMER, Jeffrey J.
12555 La Cresta
Los Altos, CA 94022 / US
Representative(s)Wright, Simon Mark
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Wright, Simon Mark
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2003/26]Wright, Simon Mark
J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London, WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date01959424.101.08.2001
[2003/26]
WO2001US24217
Priority number, dateUS20000223269P03.08.2000         Original published format: US 223269 P
US20000224456P10.08.2000         Original published format: US 224456 P
US20000226410P18.08.2000         Original published format: US 226410 P
US20000228140P25.08.2000         Original published format: US 228140 P
US20000230067P31.08.2000         Original published format: US 230067 P
US20000231434P08.09.2000         Original published format: US 231434 P
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0212340
Date:14.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1320600
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002
[2003/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12N15/11, C12N15/63, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, C07K16/18, C07K16/28, A01K67/027, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68, A61K38/17, A61K39/395
[2003/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTER UND IONENKANÄLE[2003/26]
English:TRANSPORTERS AND ION CHANNELS[2003/26]
French:TRANPORTEURS ET CANNEAUX D'ION[2003/26]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2003National basic fee paid 
19.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.02.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/26]
23.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/02]
11.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[E]EP1130094  (HELIX RES INST [JP]) [E] 1,3,6-12 * abstract *;
 [PX]WO0112660  (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3,6-12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9941373  (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9845313  (AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al);
 [A]FR2771103  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]);
 [A]EP0834561  (UNIV LEIDEN [NL]);
    [] - OTA T ET AL, "Human full-length cDNA, SEQ ID NO: 3704.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AAK94689, XP002202476
    [] - OTA T ET AL, "Human polypeptide, SEQ ID NO: 3705.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AAM93737, XP002202477
 [PX]  - OSADA N ET AL, "BRAIN CDNA, CLONE MNCB-2717.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. Q9JJC0, XP002202478 [PX] 1,3
 [X]  - BIRREN B ET AL, "Homo sapiens chromosome 17 clone CTD-3165O8 map 17, WORKING DRAFT SEQUENCE, 19 unordered pieces.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AC015918, XP002202479 [X] 1,3,11,12
 [X]  - NCI-CGAP, "wg50b09.x1 Soares_NSF_F8_9W_OT_PA_P_S1 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:2368505 3' similar to TR:O60669 O60669 MONOCARBOXYLATE TRANSPORTER 2.;, mRNA sequence.", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. AI742291, XP002202480 [X] 1,3,11,12
 [A]  - COOPER E C ET AL, "Ion channel genes and human neurological disease: Recent progress, prospects, and challenges", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19990427), vol. 96, no. 9, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 4759 - 4766, XP002174532

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.9.4759