Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315667

EP1315667 - SINGLE MOLECULE ARRAY ON SILICON SUBSTRATE FOR QUANTUM COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2006
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2006Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2006  [2006/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qucor Pty Ltd
Rupert Myers Bldg, level 2, Gate 14 Barker Street Sydney
New South Wales 2052 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
Qucor Pty Ltd
Rupert Myers Bldg, level 2, Gate 14 Barker Street Sydney
New South Wales 2052 / AU
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
UNISEARCH LIMITED
Rupert Myers Building, Level 2, Gate 14, Barker Street, UNSW
Sydney, NSW 2052 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / CLARK, Robert, Graham
10 Curban Street
Balgowlah Heights, NSW 2093 / AU
02 / DZURAK, Andrew, Steven
Flat 22 6-8 Farrell Avenue
Darlinghurst New South Wales 2010 / AU
03 / O'BRIEN, Jeremy, Lloyd
14 Blackheath Street
Leura, NSW 2780 / AU
04 / SCHOFIELD, Steven, Richard
9 Frenchmans Road
Randwick, NSW 2031 / AU
05 / SIMMONS, Michelle, Yvonne
3/139 Coogee Bay Road
Coogee, NSW 2034 / AU
 [2003/38]
Former [2003/23]01 / CLARK, Robert, Graham
10 Curban Street
Balgowlah Heights, NSW 2093 / AU
02 / DZURAK, Andrew, Steven
136/71 Victoria Street
Potts Point, NSW 2011 / AU
03 / O'BRIEN, Jeremy, Lloyd
14 Blackheath Street
Leura, NSW 2780 / AU
04 / SCHOFIELD, Steven, Richard
9 Frenchmans Road
Randwick, NSW 2031 / AU
05 / SIMMONS, Michelle, Yvonne
3/139 Coogee Bay Road
Coogee, NSW 2034 / AU
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date01959978.624.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001AU01057
Priority number, dateAU2000PQ0975930.08.2000         Original published format: AU PQ975900
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0218266
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315667
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:B82B3/00, H01L21/3213, G06N1/00
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARRAY VON EINZELNEN MOLEKÜLEN AUF EINEM SILIZIUMSUBSTRAT FÜR EINEN QUANTENCOMPUTER[2003/23]
English:SINGLE MOLECULE ARRAY ON SILICON SUBSTRATE FOR QUANTUM COMPUTER[2003/23]
French:MATRICE MONOMOLECULES SUR SUBSTRAT DE SILICIUM POUR ORDINATEUR QUANTIQUE[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase04.03.2003National basic fee paid 
04.03.2003Search fee paid 
04.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
04.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
01.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/36]
01.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/37]
06.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.162(4)  [2006/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200505   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0567985  (TSUBOCHI KAZUO [JP])
 [T]  - O'BRIEN J.L. ET AL, "Towards the fabrication of phosphorus qubits for a silicon quantum computer", PHYSICAL REVIEW B, APS, NEW YORK, (20010921), vol. 64, no. 21, pages 161401-1 - 161401-4, XP002966020
 [A]  - TUCKER J.R. AND CHEN T.-C., "Prospects for atomically ordered device structures based on STM lithography", SOLID-STATE ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER, GREAT BRITAIN, (1998), vol. 42, no. 7-8, pages 1061 - 1067, XP004127543

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0038-1101(97)00302-X