Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315806

EP1315806 - METHOD FOR SCREENING HIGHLY ACTIVE PROTEASES AND INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogsho̸jvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / PEDERSEN, Poul, Erik
Marienborg Alle 33
DK-2860 Soborg / DK
02 / NÖRREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads
Ellebakken 5
DK-3460 Birkeröd / DK
 [2003/28]
Former [2003/23]01 / PEDERSEN, Poul, Erik
Marienborg Alle 33
DK-2860 Soborg / DK
02 / NORREGAARD-MADSEN, Mads
Munkerisvej 21 2tv
DK-5930 Odense M / DK
Application number, filing date01960178.017.07.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001DK00503
Priority number, dateDK2000000127329.08.2000         Original published format: DK 200001273
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0218588
Date:07.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315806
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1315806
Date:28.12.2005
Language:EN
[2005/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE07.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/10, C12N15/62, C12Q1/37, C07K1/04
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SCREENING VON HOCHAKTIVEN PROTEASEN UND HEMMSTOFFEN[2003/23]
English:METHOD FOR SCREENING HIGHLY ACTIVE PROTEASES AND INHIBITORS[2003/23]
French:PROCEDE DE CRIBLAGE DE PROTEASES HAUTEMENT ACTIVES ET LEURS INHIBITEURS[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2003National basic fee paid 
31.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
06.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2005Fee for grant paid
27.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
01.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
CY28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
FR28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
TR28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
GB17.07.2006
IE17.07.2006
LU17.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/37]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
TR28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
GB17.07.2006
IE17.07.2006
LU17.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/36]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
IT28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
GB17.07.2006
IE17.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/28]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
GB17.07.2006
IE17.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/25]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
IE17.07.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2007/19]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
MC31.07.2006
Former [2006/51]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
DK28.03.2006
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
DE29.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/48]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
PT29.05.2006
Former [2006/45]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
NL28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/42]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
CH28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
LI28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/38]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
GR28.03.2006
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/36]AT28.12.2005
BE28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/34]AT28.12.2005
FI28.12.2005
SE28.03.2006
ES08.04.2006
Former [2006/27]FI28.12.2005
SE28.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI28.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0040745  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]);
 [A]WO9301305  (BALINT ROBERT [US])