Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1315994

EP1315994 - IMPROVED RIMLESS EYEWEAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carlon, Roberto
Castello 2971
30122 Venezia / IT
[2003/23]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2003/23]
Representative(s)Fanzini, Valeriano , et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87
40128 Bologna / IT
[N/P]
Former [2006/47]Fanzini, Valeriano , et al
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Former [2003/23]Lanzoni, Luciano , et al
c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18
40126 Bologna / IT
Application number, filing date01960991.623.08.2001
[2003/23]
WO2001IB01517
Priority number, dateIT2000BO0005208.09.2000         Original published format: IT BO000052
[2003/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0221193
Date:14.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1315994
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G02C1/02
[2003/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE RANDLOSE BRILLE[2003/23]
English:IMPROVED RIMLESS EYEWEAR[2003/23]
French:LUNETTES GLACE AMELIOREES[2003/23]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2003National basic fee paid 
25.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/23]
14.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/12]
03.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201010   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5748280  (HERMAN PAT [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 33 - column 4 * [A] 10-28,39-48;
 [XA]WO0029896  (GOLDSWORTH COMERCIO E MARKETTI [PT], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,39,46 * page 6, line 10 - page 8 * [A] 10-38,40-45;
 [X]US6007200  (TACHIBANA HIDEAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-9,39,46 * column 2, line 32 - column 5, line 15 *;
 [A]WO9518985  (DIEP YOK KONK [FR]) [A] 1-48 * page 5, line 6 - page 11, line 32 *;
 [A]US5073020  (LINDBERG POUL J [DK], et al) [A] 1,2,39,46-48 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 9 *
by applicantUS5748280