Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317379

EP1317379 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USE IN PACKING MEAT CUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sealed Air (New Zealand)
Corner of Avalon Drive & Foreman Road
Hamilton 2001 / NZ
[2005/43]
Former [2003/24]For all designated states
Sealed Air (NZ) Limited
Corner of Avalon Drive & Foreman Road
Hamilton 2001 / NZ
Inventor(s)01 / KOKE, John, Paul
505 River Crest Drive
Duncan, SC 29334 / US
02 / STEELE, Clifford, Bruce
14 Sorrel Crescent, Bucklands Beach
Auckland / NZ
 [2003/40]
Former [2003/24]01 / KOKE, John, Paul
32 Thirwall Lane, RD3
Cambridge / NZ
02 / STEELE, Clifford, Bruce
14 Sorrel Crescent, Bucklands Beach
Auckland / NZ
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date01961462.722.08.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001NZ00169
Priority number, dateNZ2000050648922.08.2000         Original published format: NZ 50648900
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0216210
Date:28.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317379
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002
[2003/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1317379
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU28.02.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:B65B59/00, B65B57/10, B65B35/24
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN VON FLEISCHSTÜCKEN[2003/24]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR USE IN PACKING MEAT CUTS[2003/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DESTINES A L'EMBALLAGE DE COUPES DE VIANDE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2003National basic fee paid 
05.03.2003Search fee paid 
05.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
05.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
20.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2006Fee for grant paid
07.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
TR03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE22.08.2007
LU22.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
[2009/42]
Former [2009/37]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE22.08.2007
LU22.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/33]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
CY03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE22.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/45]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
IE22.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/23]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/20]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
GR04.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2008/01]AT03.01.2007
BE03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/46]AT03.01.2007
CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/40]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
NL03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/38]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
SE03.04.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/37]CH03.01.2007
FI03.01.2007
LI03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Former [2007/36]FI03.01.2007
PT04.06.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US1561301  (LINTON BAUSMAN ALONZO) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0089212  (ISHIDA SCALE MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
International search[X]EP0089212  ;
 [X]WO8906782  (EMVE I AASTORP AB [SE]);
 [A]GB2285126  (NEWMAN PAUL BERNARD DAVID [GB]);
 [A]WO9800338  (SEALED AIR NZ LTD [NZ], et al);
 [A]WO8912397  (LUMETECH AS [DK]);
 [X]US4219989  (ANDREWS H DAVID [US]);
 [X]US3872644  (GIRAUDI GIORGIO A M, et al);
 [X]US5685129  (BAKER DARRYL S [US]);
 [X]JPH0966906  (FUJI MACHINERY CO);
 [X]US5782056  (MAY DENNIS J [US], et al);
 [X]US5483786  (GIESBRECHT KEN [CA], et al)