Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1317722

EP1317722 - PROPERTY RATING AND RANKING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2004
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.10.2004  [2004/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Case Shiller Weiss, Inc.
1698 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
[2003/24]
Inventor(s)01 / WEISS, Allan, N.
84 Irving Street
Cambridge, MA 02138 / US
 [2003/24]
Representative(s)Feldkamp, Rainer , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/24]Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Garmischer Strasse 4
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date01961847.901.08.2001
[2003/24]
WO2001US24131
Priority number, dateUS20000222517P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222517 P
US20000222400P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222400 P
US20000222391P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222391 P
US20000222515P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222515 P
US20000222401P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222401 P
US20000222399P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222399 P
US20000222452P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222452 P
US20000222514P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222514 P
US20000222453P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222453 P
US20000222397P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222397 P
US20000222493P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222493 P
US20000222516P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222516 P
US20000222513P02.08.2000         Original published format: US 222513 P
US20000231928P11.09.2000         Original published format: US 231928 P
[2003/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0211038
Date:07.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1317722
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2003/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMMOBILIENBEWERTUNGS- UND EINSTUFUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2003/24]
English:PROPERTY RATING AND RANKING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2003/24]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION ET DE CLASSEMENT DE PROPRIETE[2003/24]
Entry into regional phase03.03.2003National basic fee paid 
03.03.2003Search fee paid 
03.03.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
03.03.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
06.05.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
02.09.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
01.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/42]
07.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200303   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AP]US6178406  (CHEETHAM WILLIAM ESTEL [US], et al);
 [AP]US6115694  (CHEETHAM WILLIAM ESTEL [US], et al);
 [A]US5857174  (DUGAN JOHN W [US]);
 [A]US5414621  (HOUGH JOHN R [US]);
 [AP]US6141648  (BONISSONE PIERO PATRONE [US], et al);
 [A]US5754850  (JANSSEN RICHARD R [US])