EP1304958 - AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM SYSTEM FOR SYNTHESIZING LEADS AND PROVIDING AN ACCURACY MEASURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Draeger Medical Systems, Inc. 16 Electronics Avenue Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2004/06] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIJ, Simon, H. Wilhelminastraat 43 NL-3271 BX Mijnsheerenland / NL | 02 /
NELWAN, Stefan, P. Lodewijk Pincoffweg 476 NL-3071 AS Rotterdam / NL | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake & Co Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01961862.8 | 03.08.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001US24300 | Priority number, date | US20000222806P | 03.08.2000 Original published format: US 222806 P | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0211615 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304958 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1304958 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0428, G06F17/00 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
A61B5/327 (EP,US);
A61B5/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/339 (EP,US);
A61B5/341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Title | German: | ELEKTROKARDIOLOGISCHES SYSTEM ZUR SYNTHESIERUNG VON ABLEITUNGEN UND LIEFERUNG EINER GENAUEN MESSUNG | [2003/18] | English: | AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM SYSTEM FOR SYNTHESIZING LEADS AND PROVIDING AN ACCURACY MEASURE | [2003/18] | French: | SYSTEME D'ELECTROCARDIOGRAMME DESTINE A SYNTHETISER DES DERIVATIONS ET A FOURNIR UNE MESURE DE PRECISION | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08155532.8 / EP1952761 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.2008 | BE | 19.11.2008 | CY | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IT | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | IE | 03.08.2009 | LU | 03.08.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.08.2009 | ||
LU | 03.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
IE | 03.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
BE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4850370 (DOWER GORDON E [CA]) [Y] 7,8,11-14,30-33 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 49; tables 2,4 *; | [A]US5711304 (DOWER GORDON EWBANK [CA]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 27; tables 1-4 *; | [PXAY]US6119035 (WANG JYH-YUN J [US]) [PX] 1-3 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 31 * * column 10, line 8 - column 14, line 18; tables 2A,2B,2C,3 * [A] 4-6,15,17,20-24,27-29 [Y] 7,8,11-14,30-33; | [A] - SCHERER J A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF THE 12 LEAD ELECTROCARDIOGRAM FROM A 3 LEAD SEMI-ORTHOGONAL SUBSET USING PATIENT-SPECIFIC LINEAR TRANSFORMATIONARRAYS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY MEETING. WASHINGTON, SEPT. 25 - 28, 1988, WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (1989), vol. MEETING 15, ISBN 0-8186-1949-X, pages 449 - 451, XP002004856 [A] 1,8,17,24,31,33 * abstract * * page 449, column L, line 1 - page 450, column L, line 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.1988.72657 | by applicant | US5490515 |