Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1325580

EP1325580 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATING SPREAD SPECTRUM SIGNALS USING VARIABLE SIGNAL CONSTELLATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  21.06.2013
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2013Refusal of applicationpublished on 24.07.2013  [2013/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/01]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
7001 Development Drive
Research Triangle Park, N.C. 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENT, Paul
637 Eaglepoint Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
 [2003/28]
Representative(s)Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Radio Networks
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2005/17]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/01]Sjöberg, Mats Hakan , et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2003/28]Wennerholm, Kristian , et al
Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date01962282.822.08.2001
[2003/28]
WO2001US26218
Priority number, dateUS2000068630411.10.2000         Original published format: US 686304
[2003/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO0231985
Date:18.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1325580
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04L27/34
[2003/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2003/28]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPREIZSPEKTRUMKOMMUNIKATION MIT VERÄNDERLICHEN SIGNALKONSTELLATIONEN[2003/28]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR COMMUNICATING SPREAD SPECTRUM SIGNALS USING VARIABLE SIGNAL CONSTELLATIONS[2003/28]
French:SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE COMMUNIQUER DES SIGNAUX A SPECTRE ETALE AU MOYEN DE CONSTELLATIONS DE SIGNAUX VARIABLES[2003/28]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2003National basic fee paid 
10.04.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.2002Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.04.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
14.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2009Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/30]
09.03.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.05.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/30]
Appeal following examination11.05.2009Appeal received No.  T1427/09
17.06.2009Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2013Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
03.05.2013Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9939472  (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-44,48-54,67-89,93-96 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 1 * * page 13, line 2 - line 26 * * figures 2,5 *;
 [X]WO9945660  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,16,48,67,93 * page 5, line 17 - line 22 * * page 12, line 11 - page 14, line 17 * * figures 3,4 * * page 17, line 10 - page 18, line 1 * * page 21, line 9 - line 14 * * page 22, line 15 - page 23, line 2 * * page 35, line 16 - page 36, line 18 *
by applicantWO9939472
 WO9945660
 US5781542